Global Patent Index - EP 0737427 B1

EP 0737427 B1 2001-03-28 - Adjustable link for articulated bracelet

Title (en)

Adjustable link for articulated bracelet

Title (de)

Verstellbares Glied für Gliederarmband

Title (fr)

Maillon réglable pour bracelet à maillons

Publication

EP 0737427 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96105409 A

Priority

FR 9504334 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0737427A1] The adjustable link (10) which is incorporated in a bracelet composed of several links is made so that its length can be manually adjusted. The adjustable link has fasteners (4,5) for connecting to another link in the bracelet. The link has a U shaped cover (6) to which is fixed the first fastener and a rectangular tubular section base (7), to which is fastened the second fastener (5), able to slide in the cover. A mechanism (8) with push buttons (9,10) enables choosing one of the two lengths that the link offers. The cover branches (11,12) have a rail (13,14) turned towards the inside of the U. The external faces (15,16) of the base small sides each have a groove (17,18) which slide on the rails. One of the faces (19) of the large sides is closed and the other (20) is provided with racks (21,22), each having two teeth (23',24',23,24), in the bracelet longitudinal direction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A44C 5/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44C 5/04 (2006.01); A44C 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A44C 5/02 (2013.01); A44C 5/246 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0737427 A1 19961016; EP 0737427 B1 20010328; CN 1121170 C 20030917; CN 1138441 A 19961225; DE 69612228 D1 20010503; DE 69612228 T2 20020613; FR 2732866 A1 19961018; FR 2732866 B1 19970523; HK 1014143 A1 20011102; JP 3869039 B2 20070117; JP H08308615 A 19961126; SG 40843 A1 19970614; US 5623838 A 19970429

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150430

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151103

2016-01-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20151231

2015-11-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69612228

2014-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140422

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140321

- Year of fee payment: 19

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090404

2009-12-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090404

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070404

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080326

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060430

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-03-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-11 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010614

2001-06-27 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BOTTI & FERRARI S.R.L.

2001-05-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69612228 20010503

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-07-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990610

1998-12-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THE SWATCH GROUP MANAGEMENT SERVICES AG

1997-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970416

1996-10-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT