Global Patent Index - EP 0737526 B1

EP 0737526 B1 2000-03-29 - Bending machine

Title (en)

Bending machine

Title (de)

Biegemaschine

Title (fr)

Machine à cintrer

Publication

EP 0737526 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95203133 A

Priority

NL 1000150 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0737526A1] Arrangement for bending pipes (1), comprising a central bending head (6,7) and a clamping device. In order to achieve a grip of a more radial symmetry, the clamping device consisting of two clamping parts (8,9) is provided with at least one additional clamping part (15), contacting the pipe (1) to be bent at the joint face of the two clamping parts (8,9). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 7/024

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 7/02 (2006.01); B21D 7/024 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 7/02 (2013.01); B21D 7/024 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0737526 A1 19961016; EP 0737526 B1 20000329; DE 69515985 D1 20000504; DE 69515985 T2 20001102; NL 1000150 C1 19961015

INPADOC legal status


2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090603

2009-09-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081130

2009-08-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090601

2009-07-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090601

2009-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *DYNOBEND B.V.

- Effective date: 20081130

2008-04-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20071128

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-03-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20071128

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071130

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20071029

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-11-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051116

2004-09-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: DYNOBEND B.V.

2001-07-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-07-04 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20001116

2001-03-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-11-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001116

2000-08-25 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-06-02 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO ROMA S.P.A.

2000-05-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69515985 20000504

2000-03-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-29 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE GB IT LI NL

1997-11-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970924

1997-05-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970313

1996-10-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE GB IT LI NL