Global Patent Index - EP 0737545 B1

EP 0737545 B1 2000-06-14 - Apparatus for superfinishing both sides of a workpiece

Title (en)

Apparatus for superfinishing both sides of a workpiece

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum beidseitigen Feinstbearbeiten eines Werkstücks

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour la superfinition de deux faces d'une pièce

Publication

EP 0737545 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96103740 A

Priority

DE 19513383 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0737545A2] The device has a first tool (11) rotatably mounted in a first tool spindle (6) for finishing one surface of the workpiece (17) and a second tool (12) rotatably mounted in a second spindle (7) for finishing the other surface. The first tool spindle (6) is set rotatable in a first orbit spindle (1) and the axis (8) of the tool spindle (6) and axis (3) of the orbit spindle have first spacing (10) from each other. The second tool spindle is set in a second orbit spindle so that the axis (9) of the second tool spindle (7) and the axis (4) of the second orbit spindle (2) have a second spacing (27) from each other. When finishing the workpiece the two orbit spindles and two tool spindles are set in rotation.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B24B 7/17; B24B 11/00; B24B 33/055

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 7/17 (2006.01); B24B 11/00 (2006.01); B24B 33/055 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 7/17 (2013.01); B24B 11/00 (2013.01); B24B 33/055 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19513383 A1 19961010; DE 19513383 C2 19971120; EP 0737545 A2 19961016; EP 0737545 A3 19970813; EP 0737545 B1 20000614; US 5720652 A 19980224

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051001

2004-05-17 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20040517

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-11-04 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EUG

2003-10-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20030309

2003-03-10 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030310

2003-03-09 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030309

2002-03-25 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020325

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-02-20 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020220

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-05-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-11-10 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-08-09 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20000714

2000-07-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59605427

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-07-20

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB SE

2000-03-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SUPFINA GRIESHABER GMBH & CO.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-03-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ROBERT BOSCH GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1999-06-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990428

1998-02-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19971210

1997-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB SE

1996-10-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB SE