Global Patent Index - EP 0737737 B1

EP 0737737 B1 2000-06-28 - Method for cleaning surfaces

Title (en)

Method for cleaning surfaces

Title (de)

Verfahren zum Reinigen von Oberflächen

Title (fr)

Méthode pour le nettoyage de surfaces

Publication

EP 0737737 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96200954 A

Priority

NL 1000065 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0737737A1] The present invention provides a method for cleaning surfaces, such as walls and ceilings, comprising of applying a foaming cleaning agent preferably containing hydrogen peroxide by means of an application instrument, such as a roller, paint brush, cloth, sponge or brush, coming into contact with the surface for cleaning. The invention further relates to a cleaning agent comprising hydrogen peroxide and at least one detergent substance in an acidic watery environment. The detergent substance is anionogenic or non-ionogenic.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/39; C11D 1/14; C11D 1/75

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/39 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/0094 (2013.01); C11D 3/3947 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0737737 A1 19961016; EP 0737737 B1 20000628; DE 69608994 D1 20000803; NL 1000065 C2 19961008

INPADOC legal status


2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080404

2009-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2009-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080430

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081101

2009-01-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081101

2009-01-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20081231

2009-01-05 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20081101

2008-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20080404

2008-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *DIJA ZEIST B.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20080430

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070312

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-01-02 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070315

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-03-15 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070315

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-03-15 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070315

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-03-09 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070309

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-03-09 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20070309

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-06-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-08-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69608994

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-03

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL

1999-08-04 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 6C 11D 3/39 A, 6C 11D 1/75 B, 6C 11D 1/14 B

1999-08-04 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: METHOD FOR CLEANING SURFACES

1998-03-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980114

1997-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970414

1996-10-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB NL