Global Patent Index - EP 0737738 B1

EP 0737738 B1 2003-06-25 - Bleach tablets

Title (en)

Bleach tablets

Title (de)

Bleichmitteltabletten

Title (fr)

Comprimés d'agent de blanchiment

Publication

EP 0737738 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96610014 A

Priority

DK 44695 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0737738A2] Bleach tablets comprising in addition to optional usual adjuvants and additives 45 to 85 % by weight coated percarbonate, 0 to 20 % by weight bleach activator calculated as TAED, 1 to 50 % by weight layered silicate and/or alkali metal silicate, 0 to 25 % by weight sodium/potassium carbonate, 0 to 25 % by weight sodium/potassium bicarbonate, 5 to 35 % by weight poly-functional carboxylic acid calculated as citric acid, 0 to 8 % by weight polyethylene glycol, 0 to 5 % by weight complex-binder, 0 to 2 % by weight paraffin oil, 0 to 5 % by weight disintegrating agent, 0 to 10 % by weight polymer and 0 to 10 % by weight enzymes. The bleach tablets are intended for use together with usual fabric detergent compositions and display a good storage stability and good tablet-technical properties, such as rate of dissolution and tablet strength, and they are very environmentally desirable.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C11D 3/39; C11D 3/08; C11D 3/12; C11D 3/20; C11D 17/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C11D 3/08 (2006.01); C11D 3/12 (2006.01); C11D 3/20 (2006.01); C11D 3/39 (2006.01); C11D 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C11D 17/0073 (2013.01); C11D 3/08 (2013.01); C11D 3/1273 (2013.01); C11D 3/2086 (2013.01); C11D 3/3917 (2013.01); C11D 3/3942 (2013.01); C11D 17/0039 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0737738 A2 19961016; EP 0737738 A3 19980401; EP 0737738 B1 20030625; DE 69628784 D1 20030731; DE 69628784 T2 20040212; DK 0737738 T3 20031020; ES 2201162 T3 20040316

INPADOC legal status


2012-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-09-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100412

2011-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110705

2011-07-15 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20110715

2011-04-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100503

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100411

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100411

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101103

2011-01-21 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101230

2010-12-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100411

2010-12-13 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090429

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090429

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090430

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090424

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-07-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20090423

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090422

- Year of fee payment: 14

2004-06-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040326

2004-04-23 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2201162 T3

2003-07-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69628784 P 20030731

2003-06-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT

2003-06-25 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-03-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020117

1998-11-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980907

1998-04-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT

1996-10-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT