Global Patent Index - EP 0737760 B1

EP 0737760 B1 2000-04-19 - Platinum electroplating bath

Title (en)

Platinum electroplating bath

Title (de)

Galvanisches Platinbad

Title (fr)

Bain de dépôt électrolytique de platine

Publication

EP 0737760 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96102799 A

Priority

  • DE 19514253 A
  • DE 19547900 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0737760A1] Platinum electroplating bath, esp. for depositing thick layers, contains 5-30 g/l Pt as an amine sulphamate complex and has pH less than 1, the novelty being that the electrolyte contains max. 5 g/l free amido-sulphuric acid, 20-400 g/l strong acid (pref. sulphuric acid, methane-sulphonic acid or perchloric acid) with pH less than 1 and pref. 0.01-0.2 g/l fluorine-contg. surfactant as wetting agent. Pref. the amine sulphamate complex is the product of reaction of 1 mol. Pt(II) diamine di:nitrite with 4-6 mol. amidosulphuric acid.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C25D 3/50; C25D 3/56

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C25D 3/50 (2006.01); C25D 3/52 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C25D 3/50 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0737760 A1 19961016; EP 0737760 B1 20000419; JP H08319595 A 19961203; US 5620583 A 19970415

INPADOC legal status


2005-12-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051031

2005-10-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-10-12 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050223

2005-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050901

2005-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050228

2005-02-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050224

2005-02-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050224

2004-02-09 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20040209

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-02-03 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040203

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-02-03 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040203

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-01-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040130

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-09-04 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-05 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000609

2000-05-25 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604983 20000525

2000-05-24 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-04-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-04-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1999-09-08 [RAP3] CORRECTION OF THE ADDRESS OR NAME OF APPLICANT (A DOCUMENT)

- Owner name: DEGUSSA-HUELS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

1999-06-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DEGUSSA-HUELS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

1997-11-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19971014

1996-11-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960905

1996-10-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI