Global Patent Index - EP 0737763 B1

EP 0737763 B1 2000-12-27 - Production and application of a permanently deformable textil material made out of hybrid yarn

Title (en)

Production and application of a permanently deformable textil material made out of hybrid yarn

Title (de)

Hybridgarn und daraus hergestelltes permanent verformbares Textilmaterial, seine Herstellung und Verwendung

Title (fr)

Fabrication et utilisation d'un matériau textile mis en forme de manière permanente et réalisé à partir d'un fil hybride

Publication

EP 0737763 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96105008 A

Priority

DE 19513506 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0737763A2] Hybrid yarn comprises: (A) reinforcing filaments with: (i) an initial modulus of more than 600 (800-25,000, pref. 2000-20,000) cN/tex; (ii) a max. tensile strength of more than 60 (80-220, pref. 100-200) cN/tex; (iii) a max. elongation of 0.01-20 (0.1-7.0 pref. 1-5) %; and (iv) a degree of crimping of 5-60 (12-50, pref. 18-36) %; and (B) thermoplastic matrix filaments with a m.pt. at least 10 (20-100, pref. 30-70) degrees C below the m.pt. of (A). Also claimed are: (i) permanently ductile textile sheet contg. an amt. of hybrid yarn sufficient to have a significant effect on the ductility of the sheet; (ii) fibre-reinforced mouldings; (iii) a process for the prodn. of hybrid yarn from components (A) and (B) in a swirling or blow-texturing system in which at least (A) is introduced with an overfeed of 5-60%; (iv) a process for the prodn. of textile sheet as above (i) by weaving, knitting, laying or matting; and (v) a process for the prodn. of mouldings as above (ii) by forming textile sheet (i) at a temp. above the m.pt. of (B) and below the m.pt. of (A).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D02G 3/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C08J 5/04 (2006.01); B29C 70/10 (2006.01); D02G 3/04 (2006.01); D02G 3/16 (2006.01); D02G 3/40 (2006.01); D02J 1/08 (2006.01); D03D 1/00 (2006.01); D03D 15/12 (2006.01); D04B 1/00 (2006.01); D04H 1/42 (2006.01); D06C 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D02G 3/402 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2922 (2013.01); Y10T 428/2929 (2013.01); Y10T 442/313 (2015.04); Y10T 442/438 (2015.04); Y10T 442/627 (2015.04); Y10T 442/629 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0737763 A2 19961016; EP 0737763 A3 19970122; EP 0737763 B1 20001227; AT 198361 T 20010115; AU 5052796 A 19961024; AU 711934 B2 19991021; BR 9601296 A 19980113; CA 2173705 A1 19961011; CZ 9601035 A3 19970813; DE 19513506 A1 19961017; DK 0737763 T3 20010205; ES 2152448 T3 20010201; JP H08284035 A 19961029; MX 9601330 A 19970430; NO 961400 A 19961011; NO 961400 D0 19960409; PL 313680 A1 19961014; TW 393531 B 20000611; US 5792555 A 19980811

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051001

2005-06-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20040330

2005-03-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050329

2005-01-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-11-17 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040329

2004-11-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-05-25 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040525

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-03-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040330

2004-03-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040330

2004-03-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040329

2003-03-25 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20030325

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-03-24 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20030324

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-03-24 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20030324

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-03-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20030318

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-03-05 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030305

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-02-14 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

2002-11-20 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020331

2002-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020331

2002-03-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020329

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-04-23 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20010423

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-04-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-03-23 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20010323

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-02-21 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010130

2001-02-05 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-02-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2152448 T3

2001-02-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606243 20010201

2001-01-25 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A.

2000-12-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI SE

2000-12-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 198361 T 20010115

2000-08-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HOECHST TREVIRA GMBH & CO. KG

2000-07-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI SE

2000-04-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990715

1999-09-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990715

1997-09-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970722

1997-01-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

1996-10-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI SE