Global Patent Index - EP 0737786 B1

EP 0737786 B1 2000-05-03 - Lintel made of masonry with a carrier construction

Title (en)

Lintel made of masonry with a carrier construction

Title (de)

Verblendsturz aus Mauerwerk mit einer abfangenden Vorrichtung

Title (fr)

Linteau en maçonnerie avec élément support

Publication

EP 0737786 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96107627 A

Priority

  • DE 9217654 U
  • DE 9300258 U
  • DE 9306276 U
  • DE 9306749 U
  • EP 93117976 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0603517A1] The masonrywork in the form of a facing lintel, having stretcher layers and having a stretcher layer or rowlock located therebeneath and having a reinforcement (10 to 12) embedded in the joints (17), in the mortar, is designed in such a manner that, in order to produce a bond between compression and tension zones of the composite lintel, in the case of which the compressively bearing bricks of the stretcher layer (15) form, via the reinforcement (100), an anchorage system which retains the bricks, of the rowlock (16), provided beneath the reinforcement (100), [lacuna]. Said reinforcement (100) is composed of parallel longitudinal bars (10, 11) and arcuate bows (13), or panels, which are arranged perpendicularly with respect to the longitudinal bars and extend into the stretcher layer and into the rowlock, the bows (13) guided into the stretcher layer (15) of the composite lintel extending into the adjacent mortar or cement/mortar joint (18) located parallel to the longitudinal joint (17). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04C 3/02; E04B 2/10; E04C 5/00; E04C 5/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/41 (2006.01); E04B 2/10 (2006.01); E04C 3/02 (2006.01); E04C 5/00 (2006.01); E04C 5/02 (2006.01); E04C 5/06 (2006.01); E04C 5/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04B 1/7046 (2013.01); E04B 1/41 (2013.01); E04B 1/4178 (2013.01); E04B 2/10 (2013.01); E04C 3/02 (2013.01); E04C 5/02 (2013.01); E04C 5/06 (2013.01); E04C 5/0604 (2013.01); E04C 2003/023 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK GB LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0603517 A1 19940629; EP 0603517 B1 19970730; DE 59307015 D1 19970904; DE 59310015 D1 20000525; DE 59310029 D1 20000608; DK 0603517 T3 19971027; EP 0737786 A1 19961016; EP 0737786 B1 20000503; EP 0745741 A2 19961204; EP 0745741 A3 19961218; EP 0745741 B1 20000419

INPADOC legal status


2014-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20131106

2013-11-06 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59310029

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130122

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-08-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110601

2011-06-15 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110601

2010-02-26 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20091123

- Year of fee payment: 17

2003-07-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: ELMENHORST BAUSPEZIALARTIKEL GMBH & CO. KG

2002-06-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20011105

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011105

2001-07-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-04-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-11-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20001130

2000-10-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20001023

- Year of fee payment: 8

2000-09-29 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-08-03 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000803

2000-08-03 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000803

2000-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59310029 20000608

2000-05-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000504

2000-05-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-05-03 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 603517

2000-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK GB LI NL SE

1999-10-06 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: LINTEL MADE OF MASONRY WITH A CARRIER CONSTRUCTION

1999-03-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990209

1996-10-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960514

1996-10-16 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 603517

1996-10-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK GB LI NL SE