Global Patent Index - EP 0737814 B1

EP 0737814 B1 2000-03-01 - Compressor

Title (en)

Compressor

Title (de)

Verdichter

Title (fr)

Compresseur

Publication

EP 0737814 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96810177 A

Priority

DE 19513508 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0737814A1] A compressor has a compressor wheel (1) consisting of a hub(2) made of endless fibre-reinforced thermoplastic and fitted with conforming vanes (5) separately prefabricated from endless fibre-reinforced thermoplastics. Pref. the hub (2) is made by simultaneously heating and winding a prefabricated carbon fibre-reinforced thermoplastics (pref. polyphenylene sulphide or polyetherketone) tape.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 29/02; F04D 29/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/02 (2006.01); F04D 29/28 (2006.01); F04D 29/62 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/023 (2013.01); F04D 29/284 (2013.01); F05D 2300/43 (2013.01); F05D 2300/603 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0737814 A1 19961016; EP 0737814 B1 20000301; CN 1136142 A 19961120; CZ 9600958 A3 19961016; DE 19513508 A1 19961017; JP H08296590 A 19961112; PL 313679 A1 19961014; US 5632601 A 19970527

INPADOC legal status


2001-02-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-01-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010103

2000-08-30 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000301

2000-07-28 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-04-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604509 20000406

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2000-03-01 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000301

2000-03-01 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000301

1999-09-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990719

1997-05-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970310

1996-10-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB