Global Patent Index - EP 0737936 B1

EP 0737936 B1 2000-10-11 - Counting disc of a sheet counting apparatus

Title (en)

Counting disc of a sheet counting apparatus

Title (de)

Zählscheibe eines Blatt-Zählgeräts

Title (fr)

Disque de comptage d'un appareil de comptage de feuilles

Publication

EP 0737936 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96810197 A

Priority

CH 103095 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0737936A1] The rotating disk (1) has sections (2) equally spaced around its circumference, with tongues (3) extending in the direction of rotation of the disk (1). Each section (2) has a count opening (9) which causes a pneumatic count pulse to be output when it is covered by a sheet. Each section (2) also has a suction depression (4) whose width and depth increase in the direction opposite to the sense of rotation of the disk (1). Each section (2) also has a group of suction openings lying one after the other arranged in the depression (4). The openings are intermittently connected to vacuum sources via suction channels (6,7) such that in operation, the section in question leaf through the corners of all sheets in a stack. This separates the sheets from each other by suction and deformation and brings about the counting of the sheets. The suction openings in question lie in the middle of the suction depression (4). The section (7) of the channel opening out into the openings is aligned perpendicular to the disk plane and to the base of the suction depression. The suction force thus acts centrally on the depression and perpendicular to the base of the depression.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G06M 9/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06M 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06M 9/025 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0737936 A1 19961016; EP 0737936 B1 20001011; AT 196955 T 20001015; CA 2173675 A1 19961011; CA 2173675 C 20061010; DE 59605976 D1 20001116; JP H08315103 A 19961129

INPADOC legal status


2012-09-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100330

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100329

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100329

2011-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101001

2011-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-12-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20101130

2010-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100329

2010-11-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100329

2010-11-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-10-29 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-04-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: BA-GIORI S.A.

- Free text: KBA-GIORI S.A.#4, RUE DE LA PAIX#1003 LAUSANNE (CH) -TRANSFER TO- KBA-GIORI S.A.#AVENUE DU GREY 55 CASE POSTALE 347#1000 LAUSANNE 22 (CH)

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090325

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090330

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090318

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20090324

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-06-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090324

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090324

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-04-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090324

- Year of fee payment: 14

2005-05-25 [27O] OPPOSITION REJECTED

- Effective date: 20050106

2003-04-09 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: KBA-GIORI S.A.

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-09-05 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: PELCOMBE LIMITED,TRADING AS VACUUMATIC

- Effective date: 20010709

2001-02-02 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-12-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001113

2000-11-21 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUGNION S.P.A.

2000-11-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605976 20001116

2000-10-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-10-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE

2000-10-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 196955 T 20001015

2000-03-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000124

1997-06-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970405

1996-10-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI SE