Global Patent Index - EP 0737947 A3

EP 0737947 A3 2000-03-15 - Parking system for self-service shopping trolleys

Title (en)

Parking system for self-service shopping trolleys

Title (de)

Parksystem für Selbstbedienungswagen

Title (fr)

Système de stationnement pour chariots de libre-service

Publication

EP 0737947 A3 (FR)

Application

EP 96400774 A

Priority

ES 9500711 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0737947A2] The trolley stacking system uses a series of vertically arranged platforms(2) which are arranged in a frame designed to displace them in a vertical direction. The lowest platforms is arranged so that it faces an opening from which a trolley(1) can be extracted or inserted from or onto the platform(2). If the stacking system is empty the platforms rest on each other and when a platform is full the platform it can be displaced upwards by operating a control system(10).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 7/06; A47F 10/04; G07F 17/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47F 10/04 (2006.01); G07F 7/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 7/0636 (2013.01); A47F 10/04 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB IT NL PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0737947 A2 19961016; EP 0737947 A3 20000315; ES 2120849 A1 19981101; ES 2120849 B1 19990516

INPADOC legal status


2000-07-19 [18W] WITHDRAWN

- Date of withdrawal: 20000524

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL PT

1998-04-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SEGUROLA ORMAECHE, PEDRO ANGEL

1998-04-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LOPEZ GUERRERO, JUAN MANUEL

1998-01-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SEGUROLA ORMAECHE, PEDRO ANGEL

1998-01-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ARRATE LOPEZ MENDEZ, ITXAROPENA

1996-10-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB IT NL PT