Global Patent Index - EP 0737954 B1

EP 0737954 B1 2000-08-02 - A label and label laminate

Title (en)

A label and label laminate

Title (de)

Etikett und Etikettmehrschichtenverbund

Title (fr)

Etiquette et feuille stratifiée pour étiquette

Publication

EP 0737954 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96200911 A

Priority

  • EP 89912549 A
  • US 26787788 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9005353A1] A thin film label, either clear or opaque, is printed with an ink layer (4) and a multiple-layer heat-activated adhesive layer (2, 3) for bonding to a glass container (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G09F 3/02; G09F 3/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65C 3/12 (2006.01); B05D 7/00 (2006.01); B44C 1/17 (2006.01); B65C 3/06 (2006.01); B65C 3/14 (2006.01); B65C 3/16 (2006.01); B65C 9/18 (2006.01); B65C 9/25 (2006.01); B65C 9/42 (2006.01); B65D 23/08 (2006.01); C03C 17/00 (2006.01); C03C 17/32 (2006.01); G09F 3/02 (2006.01); G09F 3/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G09F 3/10 (2013.01); B44C 1/1712 (2013.01); B65C 3/06 (2013.01); B65C 3/14 (2013.01); B65C 3/16 (2013.01); B65C 9/18 (2013.01); B65C 9/1873 (2013.01); B65C 9/25 (2013.01); B65C 9/42 (2013.01); B65D 23/0814 (2013.01); G09F 3/02 (2013.01); G09F 3/0286 (2013.01); G09F 2003/023 (2013.01); G09F 2003/0257 (2013.01); G09F 2003/0258 (2013.01); G09F 2003/0261 (2013.01); G09F 2003/027 (2013.01); G09F 2003/0272 (2013.01); G09F 2003/0273 (2013.01); G09F 2003/0275 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR GB IT NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9005353 A1 19900517; AT 157059 T 19970915; AT 168344 T 19980815; AT 195193 T 20000815; AT 293825 T 20050515; DE 68928268 D1 19970925; DE 68928268 T2 19980319; DE 68928740 D1 19980820; DE 68928740 T2 19990422; DE 68929237 D1 20000907; DE 68929237 T2 20001214; DE 68929534 D1 20050525; DE 68929534 T2 20060223; EP 0441858 A1 19910821; EP 0441858 A4 19920527; EP 0441858 B1 19970820; EP 0441879 A1 19910821; EP 0441879 A4 19920226; EP 0441879 B1 19980715; EP 0737954 A2 19961016; EP 0737954 A3 19961023; EP 0737954 B1 20000802; EP 0945842 A2 19990929; EP 0945842 A3 20000322; EP 0945842 B1 20050420; JP H04501694 A 19920326; JP H04503260 A 19920611; WO 9005031 A1 19900517; WO 9005088 A1 19900517; WO 9005667 A1 19900531

INPADOC legal status


2011-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081130

2010-07-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081108

2009-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081107

2009-10-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090603

2009-09-11 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20090731

2009-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081107

2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081107

2009-08-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090601

2009-07-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090601

2009-07-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20081107

2009-07-14 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2008-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20071116

- Year of fee payment: 19

2008-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20071122

- Year of fee payment: 19

2008-03-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20071121

- Year of fee payment: 19

2008-02-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20071121

- Year of fee payment: 19

2008-02-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20071122

- Year of fee payment: 19

2008-01-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20071122

- Year of fee payment: 19

2008-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20071130

- Year of fee payment: 19

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-12-01 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-10-12 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: SAMA PATENTS

2000-09-07 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 68929237 20000907

2000-08-02 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 441858

2000-08-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT NL SE

2000-08-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 195193 T 20000815

1999-09-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HEINEKEN TECHNICAL SERVICES B.V.

1998-11-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980924

1996-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT NL SE

1996-10-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960510

1996-10-16 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 441858

1996-10-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR GB IT NL SE