Global Patent Index - EP 0737994 B1

EP 0737994 B1 2000-07-12 - Assembly of modular electrical apparatus for distribution

Title (en)

Assembly of modular electrical apparatus for distribution

Title (de)

Zusammenbau von modulären elektrischen Apparaten für Energieverteilung

Title (fr)

Assemblage d'appareils électriques modulaires utilisables en distribution répartie

Publication

EP 0737994 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96410024 A

Priority

FR 9504678 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0737994A1] The modular components of a circuit breaker include a number of control modules (2) and at least one coupling module (16). The control modules are positioned one next to the other along the same distribution line. each module has a front panel (3) with several controls (4,5). The coupling module makes electrical and mechanical connections between control panels of different modules. Several communication modules are provided on the coupling module or on the control modules. A connection module (20) links the terminals of the control modules to a power supply line.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01H 71/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01H 71/1018 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE DK ES GB IT LI SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0737994 A1 19961016; EP 0737994 B1 20000712; CN 1054476 C 20000712; CN 1138767 A 19961225; DE 69609235 D1 20000817; DK 0737994 T3 20001106; ES 2150085 T3 20001116; FR 2733092 A1 19961018; FR 2733092 B1 19970606

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-19 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050319

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030410

2002-12-02 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2002-04-02 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020402

2002-03-20 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020320

2001-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: S.A. SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES

- Effective date: 20010331

2001-06-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010331

2001-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010331

2001-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010331

2001-03-13 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20010313

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-02-28 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20010228

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-01-10 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000712

2000-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2150085 T3

2000-11-06 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-10-13 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001013

2000-10-12 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001012

2000-10-09 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: EUROPATENT S.A.S.

2000-08-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69609235 20000817

2000-07-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-07-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES GB IT LI SE

2000-07-12 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000712

2000-03-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SA

1999-09-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHNEIDER ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES SA

1999-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990217

1997-05-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970313

1996-10-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES GB IT LI SE