Global Patent Index - EP 0738028 B1

EP 0738028 B1 2003-06-04 - Flat pin

Title (en)

Flat pin

Title (de)

Flachstecker

Title (fr)

Fiche plate

Publication

EP 0738028 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96105427 A

Priority

DE 19513590 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0738028A1] The connector pin (1) has a pair of knife halves (4,5) projecting from one end of an integral base element (2). The knife halves extend symmetrical to the longitudinal axis of the connector and to their centre lines extending parallel to this axis and cooperate to form a knife contact (3). The opposite end of the base element has an integral terminal section (13) for connection to an electrical conductor, the knife halves being spaced apart along the symmetry axis. Pref. the knife halves are provided by a pair of spaced metal strips.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/05; H01R 43/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/05 (2006.01); H01R 13/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 13/055 (2013.01); H01R 13/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0738028 A1 19961016; EP 0738028 B1 20030604; DE 19513590 A1 19961024; DE 19513590 C2 20020124; US 5823834 A 19981020

INPADOC legal status


2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101103

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090429

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060502

2007-03-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061230

2005-04-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050418

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *TYCO ELECTRONICS LOGISTICS A.G.

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040430

2004-03-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-12-03 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20030604

2003-09-15 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030915

2003-09-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030904

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59610486 P 20030710

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT SE

2003-06-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-06-04 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030604

2003-06-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030604

2002-08-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020626

2000-04-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: TYCO ELECTRONICS LOGISTICS AG

1997-01-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961104

1996-10-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT SE