Global Patent Index - EP 0738118 B1

EP 0738118 B1 2000-02-09 - CHAIN AND A METHOD FOR MAKING THE CHAIN

Title (en)

CHAIN AND A METHOD FOR MAKING THE CHAIN

Title (de)

KETTE UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

CHAINE ET SON PROCEDE DE FABRICATION

Publication

EP 0738118 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 94931609 A

Priority

  • FI 9400495 W
  • FI 934887 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9512329A1] A procedure for making a chain from filamentary material, and a corresponding chain. In the procedure, separate closed rings (1) are made of filamentary material, the ring is bent to present at least three loops (2), the loops are passed through the loops (4) of the preceding ring (3), and the loops are bent upward, that is in the assembling direction of the chain, to receive the corresponding loops of the next ring.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A44C 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44C 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A44C 11/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK FR IT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9512329 A1 19950511; DE 69423003 D1 20000316; DE 69423003 T2 20000914; EP 0738118 A1 19961023; EP 0738118 B1 20000209; FI 934887 A0 19931104; FI 93513 B 19950113; FI 93513 C 19950425

INPADOC legal status


2010-10-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20010426

- Year of fee payment: 7

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011130

2005-11-04 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051104

2004-06-02 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040602

2003-09-12 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030731

2003-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030430

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-07-02 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2001-11-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011105

2001-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010430

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-04-26 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20010426

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-01-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-16 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-05-09 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000509

2000-04-27 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: INTERPATENT ST.TECN. BREV.

2000-03-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69423003 20000316

2000-02-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR IT SE

1998-11-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980925

1996-10-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960808

1996-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE DK FR IT SE