Global Patent Index - EP 0738153 A4

EP 0738153 A4 2000-09-06 - SYNTHETIC INSULIN MIMETIC SUBSTANCES

Title (en)

SYNTHETIC INSULIN MIMETIC SUBSTANCES

Title (de)

SYNTHETISCHE INSULINMIMETISCHE SUBSTANZEN

Title (fr)

SUBSTANCES SYNTHETIQUES MIMETIQUES DE L'INSULINE

Publication

EP 0738153 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 95939794 A

Priority

  • US 9514424 W
  • US 33501594 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9614075A1] A synthetic insulin mimetic compound is disclosed. Small synthetic amines of disaccharides, such as 2-deoxy-2-amino-galactopyranosyl pinitol, are shown to mimic the action of insulin and to modulate its action.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/715; C07C 35/16; C07H 3/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07H 15/04 (2006.01); A61K 31/70 (2006.01); A61K 31/7028 (2006.01); A61K 31/7034 (2006.01); A61P 3/08 (2006.01); C07H 15/207 (2006.01); C07H 17/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07H 17/04 (2013.01); C07H 15/207 (2013.01); Y10S 514/866 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] EP 0532915 A2 19930324 - HOECHST AG [DE]
  • [A] LARNER J. ET AL: "Rat liver insulin mediator which stimulates piruvate dehydrogenase phosphatase contains galactosamine and d-chiroinositol", BIOCHEM BIOPHYS RES COMM., vol. 151, no. 3, March 1988 (1988-03-01), pages 1416 - 1426, XP000915444
  • [X] PAK Y. ET AL: "Identification and characterisation of chiroinositol containing phospholipids from bovine liver", BIOCHEM BIOPHYS RES COMM, vol. 184, April 1992 (1992-04-01), pages 1042 - 1047, XP000915442
  • [X] ZAPATA A ET AL: "Synthesis and investigation of the possible insulin-like activity of 1d-4-O- and 1d-6-O-(2-amino-2-deoxy-alpha-d-glucopyranosyl)-myo-inos itol 1-phosphate and 1d-6-O-(2-amino-2-deoxy-alpha-d-glucopyranosyl)- myo-inositol 1,2-(cyclic phosphate)", CARBOHYDRATE RESEARCH,NL,ELSEVIER SCIENTIFIC PUBLISHING COMPANY. AMSTERDAM, vol. 264, no. 1, 1 November 1994 (1994-11-01), pages 21 - 31, XP004065535, ISSN: 0008-6215
  • [T] JIANHUA Y ET AL: "GPI membrane anchors: synthesis and functional evaluation of aminoglucosyl phosphatidylinositol core analogs", BIOORGANIC & MEDICINAL CHEMISTRY LETTERS,GB,OXFORD, vol. 6, no. 14, 23 July 1996 (1996-07-23), pages 1715 - 1718, XP004134927, ISSN: 0960-894X
  • See also references of WO 9614075A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9614075 A1 19960517; CA 2180162 A1 19960517; EP 0738153 A1 19961023; EP 0738153 A4 20000906; JP H09511530 A 19971118; US 5652221 A 19970729

INPADOC legal status


2003-12-10 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030602

2002-02-27 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 31/715 A, 7C 07H 3/04 B, 7C 07C 35/16 B, 7A 61P 3/10 B

2002-02-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 31/715 A, 7C 07H 3/04 B, 7C 07C 35/16 B, 7A 61P 3/10 B

2001-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010404

2000-09-06 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20000725

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2000-08-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 31/715 A, 7C 07H 3/04 B, 7C 07C 35/16 B

1996-12-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961017

1996-12-04 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

1996-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE