Global patent index - EP 0738275 B9

EP 0738275 B9 2001-03-21 - NOVEL ANTIANDROGENIC AGENTS AND RELATED PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF USE

Title (en)

NOVEL ANTIANDROGENIC AGENTS AND RELATED PHARMACEUTICAL COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS OF USE

Title (de)

NEUE ANTIANDROGENEN MITTELN PHARMAZEUTISCHE PRÄPARATE UND VERWENDUNGEN DAVON

Title (fr)

COMPOSES ANTIANDROGENES, PREPARATIONS PHARMACEUTIQUES ASSOCIEES ET LEURS MODES D'UTILISATION

Publication

EP 0738275 B9 (EN)

Application

EP 95906160 A

Priority

  • US 9500074 W
  • US 17789994 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US5854230A] Novel antiandrogenic agents are provided. An exemplary group of compounds has the structural formula (I) <IMAGE> (I) wherein R1 through R10, a and b are as defined herein. Pharmaceutical compositions and methods for using the compounds of formula (I) to treat androgen-related clinical conditions are provided, as are methods and compositions for using the compounds as contraceptive agents.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07J 1/00; A61K 31/56; A61K 31/58; C07J 21/00; C07J 71/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/56 (2006.01); A61K 31/58 (2006.01); C07J 1/00 (2006.01); C07J 21/00 (2006.01); C07J 71/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07J 1/0085 (2013.01); C07J 21/00 (2013.01); C07J 71/0063 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

US 5854230 A 19981229; CA 2180548 A1 19950713; DE 69519368 D1 20001214; DE 69519368 T2 20010308; EP 0738275 A1 19961023; EP 0738275 B1 20001108; EP 0738275 B9 20010321; US 5723455 A 19980303; US 6083940 A 20000704; WO 9518821 A2 19950713; WO 9518821 A3 19950831

INPADOC legal status

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070105

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051229

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070131

2008-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070801

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070105

2007-11-09 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20070930

2007-10-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20070801

2007-09-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20070105

2007-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070801

2006-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060228

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-01-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060131

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-01-17 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060117

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-12-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051229

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-12-16 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20051216

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-10-31 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-04-02 [NLR4] NL: RECEIPT OF CORRECTED TRANSLATION IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AT THE INITIATIVE OF THE PROPRIETOR OF THE PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR4

2000-12-29 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-12-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69519368

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-12-14

2000-11-29 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MARIETTI E GISLON S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL

1997-12-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19971111

1997-01-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: TANABE, MASATO

1997-01-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: CHAO, WAN-RU

1997-01-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: CHONG, WESLEY K. M.

1997-01-15 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: CROWE, DAVID F.

1996-12-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: TANABE, MASATO

1996-12-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: CHAO, WAN-RU

1996-12-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: CHONG, WESLEY, K., M.

1996-12-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: CROWE, DAVID, F.

1996-10-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960806

1996-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT NL