Global Patent Index - EP 0738362 B1

EP 0738362 B1 2000-04-19 - CONCRETE PUMPING DEVICE

Title (en)

CONCRETE PUMPING DEVICE

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUM PUMPEN VON BETON

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE POMPAGE DE BETON

Publication

EP 0738362 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95938438 A

Priority

  • DE 4439930 A
  • EP 9504400 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE4439930A1] A concrete pumping device has a bearing arm that is cantilevered in its working position and that positions the end (11) of a pumping line (5). The bearing arm (8) has segments (6) that bear each at least one of the pipe segments (4) that compose the pumping line (5). In order to increase the achievable pumping height, at least one of the bearing arm segments (12) may be telescopically extended and can move from a nested initial position into at least one extended position in which the extensible bearing arm segment (12) is longer than the associated pipe segment. At least one device (17) for supplying at least one additional pipe segment (16) can be moved from a first position in which the additional pipe segment (16) is located away from the volume occupied by the pipe segments (4) into a second position in which at least one end section (20) of the additional pipe segment (16) is aligned with at least one end section (21) of a pipe segment (4). The pumping line (15) is essentially made up of the pipe segments (4) and the additional pipe segment (16).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04G 21/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04G 21/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04G 21/04 (2013.01); Y10T 137/0318 (2015.04); Y10T 137/8807 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 4439930 A1 19960509; DE 4439930 C2 19961010; CN 1133786 C 20040107; CN 1140480 A 19970115; EP 0738362 A1 19961023; EP 0738362 B1 20000419; JP 3809187 B2 20060816; JP H09507888 A 19970812; US 5913323 A 19990622; WO 9614485 A1 19960517

INPADOC legal status


2005-11-08 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051108

2001-04-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-15 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-07-05 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MARCHI & PARTNERS S.R.L.

2000-04-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): IT

2000-04-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: HUDELMAIER, GERHARD

1998-11-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981008

1996-10-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960806

1996-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): IT