Global Patent Index - EP 0738419 B1

EP 0738419 B1 2000-05-10 - FRACTIONATED-RECTIFICATION HIGH-VOLTAGE TRANSFORMER WITH GROUPED DIODES

Title (en)

FRACTIONATED-RECTIFICATION HIGH-VOLTAGE TRANSFORMER WITH GROUPED DIODES

Title (de)

HOCHSPANNUNGSFORMATOR MIT GRUPPIERTEN DIODEN FRAKTIONIERTEM GLEICHAICHTER

Title (fr)

TRANSFORMATEUR HAUTE TENSION A REDRESSEMENT FRACTIONNE AVEC DIODES REGROUPEES

Publication

EP 0738419 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95936621 A

Priority

  • FR 9501427 W
  • FR 9413332 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9614645A1] A fractionated-rectification high-voltage transformer including a voltage-boosting secondary winding (4) of which at least two output diodes (7', 9') connected to two different stages (4a, 4c) of the secondary winding are positioned on the same level and spaced from the potentiometric unit (6) forming part of the insulating housing (1). The transformer may be used in a television set cathode-ray tube power supply.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01F 38/42; H01F 27/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01F 27/40 (2006.01); H01F 38/42 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01F 27/40 (2013.01); H01F 38/42 (2013.01); H01F 2005/022 (2013.01); H01F 2027/408 (2013.01); H01F 2038/423 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9614645 A1 19960517; DE 69516842 D1 20000615; DE 69516842 T2 20001207; EP 0738419 A1 19961023; EP 0738419 B1 20000510; FR 2726686 A1 19960510; FR 2726686 B1 19961220; JP H10512713 A 19981202; TW 278306 B 19960611; US 6133698 A 20001017

INPADOC legal status


2005-10-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051027

2005-08-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-06-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050630

2005-06-15 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041027

2005-05-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050503

2004-10-27 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041027

2003-10-16 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20031016

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-10-09 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20031009

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-08-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030829

- Year of fee payment: 9

2002-01-04 [REG FR D6] PATENT ENDORSED LICENCES OF RIGHTS

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Effective date: 20011126

2001-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-08-30 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000807

2000-08-04 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: JACOBACCI & PERANI S.P.A.

2000-06-15 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69516842 20000615

2000-05-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1999-03-31 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990215

1998-03-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: THOMSON TELEVISION COMPONENTS FRANCE

1996-10-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960610

1996-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT