Global Patent Index - EP 0738480 B1

EP 0738480 B1 2000-07-26 - Articulation device for connecting bracelet links

Title (en)

Articulation device for connecting bracelet links

Title (de)

Gelenkvorrichtung zum Verbinden von Armbandgliedern

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'articulation pour relier entre eux les maillons d'un bracelet

Publication

EP 0738480 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96105860 A

Priority

FR 9504812 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0738480A1] The joint has first and second pins (4,4') attached to two adjoining links (2,2'). Connecting elements (3') join the two pins together. The joint is completely covered by a plate (1) which also covers the edges (10,10') of the adjacent links, regardless of their rotation. The cover plate is held in place by an insert (5) which fits between the two pins and grips them. The pins are connected to the two links by passing through holes (12') in lugs (11',13'). The connecting elements which join them together are in the form of pierced sleeves with holes for both pins.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A44C 5/10

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44C 5/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A44C 5/107 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0738480 A1 19961023; EP 0738480 B1 20000726; DE 69609444 D1 20000831; DE 69609444 T2 20010308; FR 2733126 A1 19961025; FR 2733126 B1 19970620

INPADOC legal status


2007-04-13 [REG CH PK] CORRECTION

- Free text: LA POURSUITE DE LA PROCEDURE APRES LE NON-PAIEMENT DE LA 9E ANNUITE A ETE ENREGISTREE PAR ERREUR. LE BREVET A ETE DEJA RADIE LE 30.04.2003 POUR LE NON

2007-04-13 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-04-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050415

2005-02-15 [REG CH AEN] MODIFICATION OF THE SCOPE OF THE PATENT

- Free text: LE BREVET A ETE REACTIVE SELON LA DEMANDE DE POURSUITE DE LA PROCEDURE DU 13.01.2005.

2005-01-13 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20050113

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-11-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041103

2004-01-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031231

2003-12-03 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030415

2003-04-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030415

2003-04-09 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20030409

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-04-26 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020426

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-03-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020327

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-11-15 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001024

2000-10-24 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: PROROGA CONCESSA IN DATA: 14.03.2001;BOTTI & FERRA

2000-08-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69609444 20000831

2000-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-07-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1999-06-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990429

1997-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970423

1996-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI