Global Patent Index - EP 0738484 A3

EP 0738484 A3 2000-03-01 - Improved extensible leg

Title (en)

Improved extensible leg

Title (de)

Verbesserter, ausgiessbarer Fuss

Title (fr)

Pied extensible amélioré

Publication

EP 0738484 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 96201012 A

Priority

IT MI950797 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0738484A2] An extensible leg for tables comprises, in combination: a tube (11) which can be translated inside the interior of a hollow space (25) defined by an external sleeve (16) and an internal rod (14). On said rod (14) an end of said tube (11) slides, the opposite end of which tube (11) is designed to be fastened to the tabletop. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 9/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 9/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 9/20 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

[XA] DE 9300489 U1 19940120 - DRAENERT STUDIO GMBH [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0738484 A2 19961023; EP 0738484 A3 20000301; EP 0738484 B1 20030917; AT 249769 T 20031015; DE 69629975 D1 20031023; DE 69629975 T2 20040722; ES 2206538 T3 20040516; IT MI950797 A1 19961021; IT MI950797 D0 19950420

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090417

2010-06-28 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090417

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091222

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090416

2010-01-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090416

2010-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091103

2010-01-22 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091231

2009-12-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090416

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080416

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080410

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20080424

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080520

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080312

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-09-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040618

2004-07-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-05-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2206538 T3

2003-10-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69629975 P 20031023

2003-09-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB

2003-09-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2003-07-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: LEONARDO S.R.L.

2002-04-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020218

2000-10-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000818

2000-03-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB

1996-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB