Global patent index - EP 0738485 B1

EP 0738485 B1 2000-02-23 - Adaptable modular shelving

Title (en)

Adaptable modular shelving

Title (de)

Anpassungsfähige modulare Regale

Title (fr)

Rayonnage modulaire adaptable

Publication

EP 0738485 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96420090 A

Priority

FR 9503458 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0738485A1] The shelves (1-4) are supported by two uprights (5, 6) and each shelf is made up from modules (12-17) which are placed side by side. The main part (18) of each module is a flat parallelepiped and its front part is closed. Its back part is open and an extension (19) slides backwards in it. The extension is a flat plate which is slightly narrower than the main part and it is guided by the sides of this. Each shelf is supported by a front cross bar (7-10) and an intermediate cross bar (11) at the back of the main parts.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 45/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 45/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 45/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR LI SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2731884 A1 19960927; FR 2731884 B1 19970509; DE 69606731 D1 20000330; EP 0738485 A1 19961023; EP 0738485 B1 20000223

INPADOC legal status

2005-01-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2003-03-13 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030313

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-02-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2000-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: PRODIC

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20000331

2000-08-11 [EN4] FR: NOTIFICATION OF NON FILING TRANSLATION IN AN EARLIER BOPI IS ERRONEOUS

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN4

2000-07-21 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-07-21 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000721

2000-05-24 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000524

2000-05-23 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000523

2000-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000331

2000-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000331

2000-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000331

2000-03-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69606731

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-30

2000-02-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR LI SE

1998-12-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981023

1997-04-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970227

1996-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR LI SE