Global Patent Index - EP 0738486 B1

EP 0738486 B1 2000-03-22 - Extendable leg with safety lock mechanism, in particular for furniture peninsulae

Title (en)

Extendable leg with safety lock mechanism, in particular for furniture peninsulae

Title (de)

Höhenverstellbarer Fuss mit Sicherheitssperrvorrichtung, insbesondere für halbinselförmig angeordnete Möbel

Title (fr)

Pied à hauteur réglable avec dispositif d'arrêt de sécurité, en particulier pour meubles disposés en forme de presqu'île

Publication

EP 0738486 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96201013 A

Priority

IT MI950280 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0738486A1] An extensible leg, in particular but not exclusively for, furniture peninsulae, comprises, in combination: a first tube (11) and a second tube (12) screw-threaded in (14) and screwed on a screw-threaded sleeve (15) integral with an end of said first tube (11). Between said tube (12) and said sleeve (15) a locking means (21,19) is provided which can be shifted between a first position in which said tubes (11,12) can be screwed on each other, and a second position in which said tubes (11,12) are stably locked in their mutual position. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 91/02; A47B 13/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 9/04 (2006.01); A47B 9/08 (2006.01); A47B 91/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 91/026 (2013.01); A47B 9/04 (2013.01); A47B 9/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0738486 A1 19961023; EP 0738486 B1 20000322; AT 190815 T 20000415; DE 69607233 D1 20000427; DE 69607233 T2 20001130; ES 2146352 T3 20000801; IT 236830 Y1 20000817; IT MI950280 U1 19961021; IT MI950280 V0 19950420

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090416

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080422

- Year of fee payment: 13

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20030514

2003-02-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2002-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-12-04 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20020416

2002-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021101

2002-04-17 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020417

2002-04-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020416

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010430

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-04-11 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010411

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-04-09 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010409

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-04-09 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010409

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-03-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-08-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-08-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2146352

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-06-19 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-04-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69607233

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-27

2000-03-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT

2000-03-22 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000322

2000-03-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 190815

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-08-18 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: EXTENDABLE LEG WITH SAFETY LOCK MECHANISM, IN PARTICULAR FOR FURNITURE PENINSULAE

1998-10-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980915

1997-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970419

1996-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FR GB IT