Global Patent Index - EP 0738594 B1

EP 0738594 B1 2000-04-05 - Method and device for application of liquids on web sheet material, particularly of printing inks

Title (en)

Method and device for application of liquids on web sheet material, particularly of printing inks

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Auftragen von Flüssigkeiten auf Folienbahnen, insbesondere von Farbdrucken

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour l'application de liquides sur des feuilles continues, en particulier d'encres d'impression

Publication

EP 0738594 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95120627 A

Priority

DE 19513888 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0738594A1] The fluid application process involves the use of a press (16), in which the inking roller (25) is dipped from above into an ink chamber (24) open at the top, extracting ink as it turns. This process may be continuous or intermittent. The inking chamber is a relatively small one. Ink can be supplied via a line (45) to the ink chamber, and from there via an output line to another ink container. The seal can be improved by sucking ink residue from the inking roller via suction channels (74,76). The ink may pass through the ink chamber in a closed circuit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 31/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 17/00 (2006.01); B41F 17/10 (2006.01); B41F 31/02 (2006.01); B41F 31/20 (2006.01); B41M 1/26 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 31/027 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0738594 A1 19961023; EP 0738594 B1 20000405; BR 9601994 A 19981006; DE 19513888 A1 19961024; JP H08318615 A 19961203; US 5674571 A 19971007

INPADOC legal status


2007-07-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070703

2006-11-17 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060831

2006-08-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051228

2005-12-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051228

2005-12-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051228

2005-12-21 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20051221

- Year of fee payment: 11

2004-12-22 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20041222

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-12-08 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20041208

- Year of fee payment: 10

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-03-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-27 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2000-05-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59508135 20000511

2000-04-26 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000405

2000-04-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

1997-07-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19970606

1996-10-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960813

1996-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT