EP 0738602 A3 19970611 - Ink jet print head
Title (en)
Ink jet print head
Title (de)
Tintenstrahlkopf
Title (fr)
Tête à jet d'encre
Publication
Application
Priority
- JP 9723995 A 19950421
- JP 9724095 A 19950421
- JP 16697195 A 19950608
- JP 16696995 A 19950608
- JP 16697095 A 19950608
- JP 11038496 A 19960405
Abstract (en)
[origin: EP0738602A2] Described is an ink jet print head which prevents the generation of ink mist by supplying a signal to a piezoelectric vibrator (9) which causes a pressure generating chamber (3) to expand by a volume smaller than the volume expanded to jet out an ink droplet, when the vibration of the meniscus generated after jetting out an ink droplet moves to the position closest to the pressure generating chamber (3). When the vibration of the meniscus generated after jetting out an ink droplet goes to the nozzle hole (2), the pressure generating chamber (3) is expanded again, to effectively attenuate the kinetic energy of the meniscus and to hold the meniscus at a position suitable for jetting out the next ink droplet. <IMAGE>
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
B41J 2/01 (2006.01); B41J 2/045 (2006.01); B41J 2/055 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP)
B41J 2/04541 (2013.01); B41J 2/04553 (2013.01); B41J 2/04581 (2013.01); B41J 2/04588 (2013.01); B41J 2/04591 (2013.01); B41J 2/04593 (2013.01)
Citation (search report)
- [XY] EP 0208484 A2 19870114 - OLIVETTI & CO SPA [IT]
- [X] US 4972211 A 19901120 - AOKI MAKOTO [JP]
- [PX] WO 9534427 A1 19951221 - CITIZEN WATCH CO LTD [JP], et al
- [X] EP 0467656 A2 19920122 - TEKTRONIX INC [US]
- [Y] EP 0271905 A2 19880622 - CANON KK [JP]
- [Y] EP 0616891 A1 19940928 - SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]
- [Y] EP 0608835 A2 19940803 - SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]
- [Y] EP 0541129 A1 19930512 - SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]
- [Y] EP 0580154 A2 19940126 - SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]
- [A] US 5146236 A 19920908 - HIRATA TOSITAKA [JP], et al
- [A] EP 0648606 A2 19950419 - TEKTRONIX INC [US]
- [A] EP 0548984 A1 19930630 - SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]
- [A] EP 0278589 A1 19880817 - AM INT [US]
- [A] WO 9426522 A1 19941124 - COMPAQ COMPUTER CORP [US]
- [A] EP 0574016 A2 19931215 - SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]
- [A] EP 0531173 A1 19930310 - BROTHER IND LTD [JP]
- [A] EP 0596530 A2 19940511 - SEIKO EPSON CORP [JP]
- [A] EP 0354706 A2 19900214 - HEWLETT PACKARD CO [US]
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 009, no. 034 (M - 357) 14 February 1985 (1985-02-14)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 015, no. 505 (M - 1194) 20 December 1991 (1991-12-20)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 173 (M - 1581) 24 March 1994 (1994-03-24)
- [A] PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 018, no. 502 (M - 1676) 20 September 1994 (1994-09-20)
Designated contracting state (EPC)
DE FR GB IT
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 0738602 A2 19961023; EP 0738602 A3 19970611; EP 0738602 B1 19990324; DE 69601823 D1 19990429; DE 69601823 T2 19991125; JP H0952360 A 19970225
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 96106318 A 19960422; DE 69601823 T 19960422; JP 11038496 A 19960405