Global patent index - EP 0738698 B1

EP 0738698 B1 2000-08-23 - Process for decomposition of cumene hydroperoxide

Title (en)

Process for decomposition of cumene hydroperoxide

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Spaltung von Cumolhydroperoxid

Title (fr)

Procédé de décomposition de l'hydropéroxyde de cumène

Publication

EP 0738698 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96202123 A

Priority

  • EP 93307016 A
  • US 94468892 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: CA2105187A1] A method for the enhanced decomposition of cumene hydroperoxide by acidic catalyst to phenol and acetone which comprises decomposing cumene hydroperoxide in a non-isothermal manner in the presence of excess acetone whereby the molar ratio of acetone to phenol in a decomposition reactor is from about 1.1: 1 to 1.5:1. A method for enhancing the selectivity of the decomposition of dicumyl peroxide to alpha methylstyrene also phenol and acetone in the presence of an acidic catalyst which comprises carrying out the decomposition at a temperature of from about 80 to 110.degree.C. A method for carrying out the decomposition of dicumyl peroxide with an acidic catalyst system which comprises performing such decomposition in the presence of the reaction product of (1) an amine with (2) an acidic material which can catalyze the decomposition of CHP. A composition comprising CHP, cumene, acidic catalyst for decomposition of CHP, dicumyl peroxide, dimethylbenzyl alcohol, phenol, and acetone wherein the acetone is in a molar ratio to phenol of from about 1.1:1 to 1.6:1. A composition comprising cumene, acidic catalyst for decomposing CHP, DCP, water, phenol, acetone and a reaction product of (1) an amine with (2) an acid which catalyzes the decomposition of CHP. A method for preparing phenol and acetone from the decomposition of CHP with an acidic catalyst which comprises (a) decomposing CHP at a specific acidic catalyst concentration and temperature thereby forming a composition comprising phenol, acetone and dicumyl peroxide, (b) transferring dicumyl peroxide to a plug flow reactor wherein decomposition of dicumyl peroxide to phenol, acetone and AMS occurs at a lower acidic catalyst concentration and a higher temperature than the catalyst concentration and temperature in step (a). A method for maintaining the control of an acid catalyzed CHP decomposition in a multiplicity of sequential reactors which comprises passing a portion of the outlet stream of the last sequential reactor into a reactor of plug flow design and a smaller size compared to the CHP decomposition reactors wherein the delta T.degree.C of the inlet temperature and the outlet temperature of said plug flow reactor is from about 4 to 16.degree.C. A method for enhancing the decomposition of CHP and producing CHP decomposition products therefrom which comprises recycling the CHP decomposition products to a CHP feedstream in the quantity of from about 10-25 times the weight of the CHP feedstream. A method for enhancing the decomposition of CHP to phenol and acetone which comprises having additional water in the CHP decomposition reactor. A CHP decomposition mass having an acetone to phenol mole ratio of about 1.1 to 1 to 1.5 to 1.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07C 1/20; C07C 15/44; C07C 37/08; C07C 39/04; C07C 45/51; C07C 45/53; C07C 49/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07B 61/00 (2006.01); C07C 1/20 (2006.01); C07C 15/44 (2006.01); C07C 15/46 (2006.01); C07C 27/12 (2006.01); C07C 37/08 (2006.01); C07C 39/04 (2006.01); C07C 45/51 (2006.01); C07C 45/53 (2006.01); C07C 49/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07C 45/517 (2013.01); C07C 1/20 (2013.01); C07C 37/08 (2013.01); C07C 45/53 (2013.01); C07C 2527/054 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. C07C 45/517 + C07C 49/08
  2. C07C 45/53 + C07C 49/08
  3. C07C 1/20 + C07C 15/44
  4. C07C 37/08 + C07C 39/04

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

US 5254751 A 19931019; CA 2105187 A1 19940315; CN 1071293 C 20010919; CN 1088051 C 20020724; CN 1089593 A 19940720; CN 1101371 C 20030212; CN 1235949 A 19991124; CN 1235952 A 19991124; DE 69323140 D1 19990304; DE 69323140 T2 20010329; DE 69323140 T3 20030724; DE 69329300 D1 20000928; DE 69329300 T2 20010208; DE 69331564 D1 20020321; DE 69331564 T2 20021010; DE 69333863 D1 20051006; DE 69333863 T2 20060614; EP 0589588 A1 19940330; EP 0589588 B1 19990120; EP 0589588 B2 20020313; EP 0738698 A2 19961023; EP 0738698 A3 19970827; EP 0738698 B1 20000823; EP 0873983 A2 19981028; EP 0873983 A3 19981209; EP 0873983 B1 20020206; EP 1142855 A1 20011010; EP 1142855 B1 20050831; ES 2127253 T3 19990416; ES 2127253 T5 20021016; ES 2148669 T3 20001016; ES 2172063 T3 20020916; JP 2002193857 A 20020710; JP 3268082 B2 20020325; JP 3281587 B2 20020513; JP 3797914 B2 20060719; JP H06293682 A 19941021; JP H10152449 A 19980609; KR 0161540 B1 19990115; US RE40668 E 20090317

INPADOC legal status

2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20130907

2013-09-07 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69329300

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2013-09-06 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Ref Legal Event Code: R071

- Ref Document Number: 69329300

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2012-12-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120829

- Year of fee payment: 20

2010-11-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090906

2010-07-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090930

2010-07-30 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100401

2010-06-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20100531

2010-05-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090906

2010-04-21 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: V1

- Effective date: 20100401

2009-02-13 [REG FR TQ] PARTIAL TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Ref Legal Event Code: TQ

2009-01-05 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: ILLA INTERNATIONAL LTD

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLS

- Effective date: 20081023

2009-01-05 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: SABIC INNOVATIVE PLASTICS IP B.V.

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLS

- Effective date: 20081023

2008-12-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080910

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080915

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-11-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080903

- Year of fee payment: 16

2008-05-28 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2005-12-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20040907

2005-09-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050906

2004-09-07 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040907

2003-10-08 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20031008

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-08-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-11-23 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DRAGOTTI & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2148669

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-10-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-09-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69329300

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-09-28

2000-08-23 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 589588

- Country of Ref Document: EP

2000-08-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

1998-09-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980731

1998-04-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19980227

1997-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

1996-10-23 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AC

- Ref Document Number: 589588

- Country of Ref Document: EP

1996-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL