Global Patent Index - EP 0738783 B1

EP 0738783 B1 2000-03-08 - Stainless austenitic steel suitable for the manufacture of wires

Title (en)

Stainless austenitic steel suitable for the manufacture of wires

Title (de)

Rostfreier austenitischer Stahl geeignet für die Herstellung von Drähte

Title (fr)

Acier inoxydable austénitique pour l'élaboration notamment de fil

Publication

EP 0738783 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96400736 A

Priority

FR 9504782 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0738783A1] Austenitic stainless steel consists of wt.%:- max. 0.2 C; max 0.2 N; 0.3-4 Mn; 14-23 Cr; 5-17 Ni; 0.3-2 Si; max 0.1 S; 0.005-0.012 O; 0.00001-0.002 Al. max 0.0002 Mg; 0.00001-0.0005 Ca; max 0.005 Ti. Inside the steel area oxide inclusions as follows:- 40-60 SiO2; 5-50 MnO; 1-30 CaO; 0.1-20 MgO; 3-25 Al2O3; 0.1-10 Cr2O3.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 38/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C22C 38/00 (2006.01); C21D 8/06 (2006.01); C22C 38/18 (2006.01); C22C 38/40 (2006.01); C22C 38/44 (2006.01); C22C 38/50 (2006.01); C22C 38/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C21D 8/065 (2013.01); C22C 38/40 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0738783 A1 19961023; EP 0738783 B1 20000308; AT 190361 T 20000315; CA 2174567 A1 19961022; CA 2174567 C 20011023; CZ 291422 B6 20030312; CZ 9601139 A3 19961113; DE 69606902 D1 20000413; DE 69606902 T2 20001109; DK 0738783 T3 20000731; EG 21379 A 20010930; ES 2145395 T3 20000701; FR 2733252 A1 19961025; FR 2733252 B1 19970523; GR 3033479 T3 20000929; IL 117977 A 20001121; IL 117977 D0 19960804; JP H08337852 A 19961224; NO 312469 B1 20020513; NO 961531 A 19961022; NO 961531 D0 19960418; PL 185044 B1 20030228; PT 738783 E 20000731; RO 116098 B 20001030; RU 2106425 C1 19980310; SI 9600129 A 19961031; TR 9600325 A2 19961121; TW 399100 B 20000721; US 5651937 A 19970729

INPADOC legal status


2004-02-11 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2003-03-31 [REG PT MF4A] REVOCATION OF NATIONAL PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20030120

2003-03-25 [REG SE ECNC] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS BEEN CANCELLED

2003-03-03 [NLR2] NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION

- Effective date: 20020614

2003-01-08 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Free text: 20020614

2003-01-02 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20020614

2002-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-04-18 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20020418

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-04-18 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20020418

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-04-16 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20020416

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-04-12 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20020412

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-04-04 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Payment date: 20020404

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-04-04 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20020404

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-04-02 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20020402

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-04-02 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20020402

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-03-29 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20020329

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-03-28 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20020328

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-03-28 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20020328

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-03-27 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20020327

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-03-27 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20020327

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-03-20 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20020320

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-03-19 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20020319

- Year of fee payment: 7

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-04-02 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: KRUPP EDELSTAHLPROFILE GMBH

2001-01-31 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: KRUPP EDELSTAHLPROFILE GMBH

- Effective date: 20001206

2000-07-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20000508

2000-07-31 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-07-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2145395 T3

2000-06-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000524

2000-05-30 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUGNION S.P.A.

2000-05-03 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2000-04-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69606902 20000413

2000-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE

2000-03-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 190361 T 20000315

1999-10-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: UGINE-SAVOIE IMPHY

1999-06-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990415

1996-10-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960823

1996-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU NL PT SE