Global patent index - EP 0738796 B1

EP 0738796 B1 2000-06-28 - Yarn supply

Title (en)

Yarn supply

Title (de)

Fadenliefervorrichtung

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'alimentation de fil

Publication

EP 0738796 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96302611 A

Priority

GB 9508197 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0738796A1] Apparatus for dispensing a predetermined length of yarn (1) in which the yarn (1) is drawn from a yarn supply (2) by a transfer means (3). The transfer means (3) includes one, and preferably two, transfer members (4,5) around which the yarn (1) is wound. Rotation of the transfer member or members (4, 5) draws yarn (1) from the yarn supply (2). The surface speed of the rotating transfer member or members (4, 5) is greater than the speed at which yarn (1) is supplied from the transfer means (3), so the yarn (1) is supplied with substantially no tension. A measuring means (7) measures a predetermined length of the yarn (1) supplied from the transfer means (3). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D03D 47/36; B65H 51/02; B65H 59/18

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65H 51/02 (2006.01); B65H 59/18 (2006.01); B65H 61/00 (2006.01); D03D 39/08 (2006.01); D03D 47/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 39/08 (2013.01); B65H 51/02 (2013.01); B65H 59/18 (2013.01); B65H 61/00 (2013.01); D03D 47/36 (2013.01); B65H 2701/31 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE GB NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0738796 A1 19961023; EP 0738796 B1 20000628; AU 5069496 A 19961031; AU 707382 B2 19990708; DE 69609000 D1 20000803; DE 69609000 T2 20001123; GB 9508197 D0 19950607

INPADOC legal status

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150415

2015-12-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20150415

2014-09-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140530

- Year of fee payment: 19

2014-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140521

- Year of fee payment: 19

2012-09-26 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120830 AND 20120905

2012-08-15 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

- Free Format Text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20120719 AND 20120725

2004-11-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041103

2003-04-24 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030424

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-01-06 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20021101

2002-11-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021101

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-09-27 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010927

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-06-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-11-24 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-08-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69609000

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-03

2000-06-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB NL

1999-02-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981217

1997-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970411

1996-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE GB NL