Global patent index - EP 0738815 B1

EP 0738815 B1 2000-02-23 - Device for connecting the ends of actuating rods for windows, doors etc.

Title (en)

Device for connecting the ends of actuating rods for windows, doors etc.

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Verbinden von zwei End-Abschnitten eines Gestänges für Fenster, Türen od. dgl.

Title (fr)

Dispositif de raccordement en bout de tige de tringlerie de fenêtres, portes etc.

Publication

EP 0738815 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95119820 A

Priority

DE 19513837 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19513837C1] The linkage actuates closing and/or control components between the leaf (10) of a door or window and its fixed frame and extends along a beam (11) in one or the other. The joint comprises a fixed covering rail (22), along the rear of which a driving rack (21) slides in the lengthwise direction. A set of coupling recesses (23) are formed in the rail, while the rack has stamped teeth (24) in one edge.The indentations forming the recesses (23) in the visible side of the rail form bosses on its rear side by which lengthwise surfaces on the rack outside the latter's teeth slide on it. These also act as distance-pieces between the rack and rail. The indentations can be in a straight line along the rail at its centre line. A lengthwise step can be formed along one or both rail edges.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05C 9/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/00 (2006.01); E05C 9/20 (2006.01); E05B 17/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05C 9/20 (2013.01); E05C 9/004 (2013.01); E05B 17/007 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19513837 C1 19960515; AT 189908 T 20000315; EP 0738815 A1 19961023; EP 0738815 B1 20000223; PL 179988 B1 20001130; PL 313686 A1 19961014

INPADOC legal status

2005-12-15 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051215

2004-09-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-08-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040831

2004-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040701

2003-12-15 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031215

2002-12-17 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021217

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-11-15 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021115

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-11-06 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20021106

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-02-07 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-03-30 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59507845

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-30

2000-03-10 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-02-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT

2000-02-23 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 189908

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2000-02-22 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: CALVANI SALVI E VERONELLI S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

1999-05-06 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990322

1997-09-17 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970310

1996-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE FR IT