Global Patent Index - EP 0738818 B1

EP 0738818 B1 2000-02-02 - Window with insulating glazing

Title (en)

Window with insulating glazing

Title (de)

Isolierglasfenster

Title (fr)

Fenêtre à vitrage isolant

Publication

EP 0738818 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96104733 A

Priority

DE 29506113 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0738818A1] The glass sheets (2) are supported on a seal inside the window frame and with lips of the frame supporting the outer sides of the glass pack. The outer lips (37) are set back towards the frame to provide a wider angle of view from inside the window. One of the window sheets is thinner than the other to lighten the structure. The outer pane of glass is the thicker, reinforced glass with the inner glass pane 1 to 2 mm thinner. The window frame sections are provided with integral seals (8) to seal the closed window. The position of the outer lip of the window frame takes into account the refraction effect when viewing out of the window.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 3/663; E06B 3/10; E06B 5/20

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/10 (2006.01); E06B 3/36 (2006.01); E06B 3/66 (2006.01); E06B 7/23 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/10 (2013.01); E06B 3/362 (2013.01); E06B 3/6621 (2013.01); E06B 7/2307 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI LU

EPO simple patent family

DE 29506113 U1 19950601; AT 189501 T 20000215; EP 0738818 A1 19961023; EP 0738818 B1 20000202

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151001

2015-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 59604341

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-05-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59604341

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE WEICKMANN & WEICKMANN, DE

2015-05-07 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59604341

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: WEICKMANN & WEICKMANN PATENTANWAELTE - RECHTSA, DE

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140528

- Year of fee payment: 19

2004-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2004-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040331

2004-03-25 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040325

2004-03-25 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040325

2003-03-25 [PGFP LU] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030325

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-03-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030324

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-03-21 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030321

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-01-17 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-06-30 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-04-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2000-04-26 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: HAMPEL, MANFRED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP2

2000-03-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59604341

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-03-09

2000-02-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-02-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI LU

2000-02-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 19960325

2000-02-02 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000202

2000-02-02 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000202

2000-02-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 189501

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-02-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-01-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19981130

1997-05-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970325

1996-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI LU

1996-10-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 960325

1996-10-23 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAX

- Free Format Text: SI PAYMENT 960325