Global Patent Index - EP 0739100 A3

EP 0739100 A3 2000-11-08 - Ancillary data processing circuit for audio decoding system

Title (en)

Ancillary data processing circuit for audio decoding system

Title (de)

Schaltung zum Verarbeiten von Zusatzdaten für ein Audiodekodiersystem

Title (fr)

Circuit de traitement des données auxiliaires pour un système de décodage audio

Publication

EP 0739100 A3 (EN)

Application

EP 96106008 A

Priority

JP 9525595 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0739100A2] An ancillary data processing circuit includes a clock masking circuit (16) and an OR circuit (15). The clock masking circuit (16) includes a counter (61) of 3 bits which is reset to zero by a synchronism detection signal (S), counts the number of clocks of a clock signal (CK) and outputs a count value (NK), a counter (62) of 3 bits which receives the count value (NK) as a preset value (NK) in response to an ancillary data start signal (SA) and counts down a clock signal (CP), a flip-flop (64) which is initialized in response to the ancillary data start signal (SA), reverses the level thereof in response to an overflow signal (DB) of the counter (62) and outputs a masking signal M, and a masking circuit (65) which calculates a combination logic of the masking signal (M) and the clock signal (CP) and outputs the clock signal (CP) or the zero level as a clock signal (CQ) in response to the level of the masking signal (M). The OR circuit (15) outputs a result of logical ORing of the clock signals (CK and CQ) as a read clock signal (CR). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04B 1/66

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G11B 20/10 (2006.01); H03M 7/40 (2006.01); H04B 1/66 (2006.01); H04L 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04B 1/665 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

  • [A] EP 0640909 A1 19950301 - TEXAS INSTRUMENTS INC [US]
  • [A] JP H05268100 A 19931015
  • [A] SCHROEDER E F ET AL: "DER MPEG-2-STANDARD: GENERISCHE CODIERUNG FUER BEWEGTBILDER UND ZUGEHOERIGE AUDIO-INFORMATION. AUDIO-CODIERUNG (TEIL 4)", FERNSEH UND KINOTECHNIK,DE,VDE VERLAG GMBH. BERLIN, vol. 48, no. 7/08, 30 August 1994 (1994-08-30), pages 364 - 368,370,37, XP000460964, ISSN: 0015-0142

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 0739100 A2 19961023; EP 0739100 A3 20001108; JP 2757818 B2 19980525; JP H08293859 A 19961105; US 5768281 A 19980616

INPADOC legal status


2006-06-14 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20051221

2004-01-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031201

2003-05-02 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NEC ELECTRONICS CORPORATION

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2000-11-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000928

2000-11-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

1996-10-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB