Global patent index - EP 0739194 B1

EP 0739194 B1 2000-07-05 - A HOIST FOR HANDLING A PATIENT AND A FEET-SUPPORTING PLATE ASSEMBLY TO BE USED IN CONNECTION WITH A HOIST FOR HANDLING A PATIENT

Title (en)

A HOIST FOR HANDLING A PATIENT AND A FEET-SUPPORTING PLATE ASSEMBLY TO BE USED IN CONNECTION WITH A HOIST FOR HANDLING A PATIENT

Title (de)

HEBEVORRICHTUNG ZUM BEWEGEN VON PATIENTEN SOWIE FUSSTÜTZPLATTE ZUM GEBRAUCH BEI EINER SOLCHEN HEBEVORRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

APPAREIL DE LEVAGE SERVANT A DEPLACER UN PATIENT ET ENSEMBLE DE PLAQUES SUPPORTANT LES GENOUX UTILISE AVEC CET APPAREIL

Publication

EP 0739194 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95905062 A

Priority

  • DK 9500022 W
  • DK 4694 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9518592A1] A hoist for raising a patient from a sitting to a standing position, or moving a patient to or from a bed or a wheelchair comprises: a supporting frame (16), a lifting lever structure including a vertical mast (32') and a substantially horizontal lever (34'). The lever (34') is connected in a hinge connection (36') to the uppermost end of the mast (32'). A feet-supporting plate assembly is including a substantially horizontal plate (60') and a crush or knee support (80') which is vertically and horizontally adjustable. For shifting the hoist from a first application, in which the patient is raised from a sitting to a standing position or lowered from a standing to a sitting position, in which application the feet-supporting plate assembly is employed, and to a second position in which the patient is freely suspended at the outermost end of the lever, a yoke assembly (44") is connected to the lever (34') through a shiftable linkage system (100).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61G 7/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61G 7/10 (2006.01); A61G 7/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61G 7/1017 (2013.01); A61G 7/1046 (2013.01); A61G 7/1051 (2013.01); A61G 7/1061 (2013.01); A61G 7/1067 (2013.01); A61G 7/1076 (2013.01); A61G 7/1094 (2013.01); A61G 7/1096 (2013.01); A61G 2200/32 (2013.01); A61G 2200/34 (2013.01); A61G 2200/36 (2013.01); A61G 2200/52 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9518592 A1 19950713; AU 1383195 A 19950801; DE 69517796 D1 20000810; DE 69517796 T2 20001123; DK 0739194 T3 20001106; EP 0739194 A1 19961030; EP 0739194 B1 20000705

INPADOC legal status

2004-01-14 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20030818

2003-10-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV4

- Effective date: 20030801

2003-09-08 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

2003-08-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030801

2003-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030131

2002-08-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020801

2002-07-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: INTERCARE SCANDINAVIA A/S

- Ref Legal Event Code: BERE

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020131

2002-01-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020131

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-09 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020109

- Year of fee payment: 8

2001-08-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLR1

- Opponent name: ANOLET A/S

2001-06-13 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: R26

- Opponent name: ANOLET A/S

- Effective date: 20010404

2001-06-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: ANOLET A/S

- Effective date: 20010404

2001-02-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010227

- Year of fee payment: 7

2001-01-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010130

- Year of fee payment: 7

2000-12-01 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2000-11-06 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2000-08-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69517796

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-08-10

2000-07-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK NL

2000-06-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: INTERCARE SCANDINAVIA A/S

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

1998-04-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19980305

1996-11-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960705

1996-10-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK NL