Global Patent Index - EP 0739267 B1

EP 0739267 B1 2001-03-14 - DEVICE ON HAND MACHINE TOOLS FOR ROTARY TOOL DRIVE

Title (en)

DEVICE ON HAND MACHINE TOOLS FOR ROTARY TOOL DRIVE

Title (de)

EINRICHTUNG AN HANDWERKZEUGMASCHINEN ZUR DREHMITNAHME VON WERKZEUGEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF D'ENTRAINEMENT EN ROTATION D'OUTILS POUR MACHINES-OUTILS MANUELLES

Publication

EP 0739267 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95903762 A

Priority

  • DE 9401535 W
  • DE 4400970 A
  • DE 4405958 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6089798A] PCT No. PCT/DE94/01535 Sec. 371 Date Dec. 2, 1996 Sec. 102(e) Date Dec. 2, 1996 PCT Filed Dec. 24, 1994 PCT Pub. No. WO95/19244 PCT Pub. Date Jul. 20, 1995A device on hand-held tool-driving machines for the coupling of pounding and/or drilling tools is proposed, wherein on the tool shank (11) and the tool holder (10) are located at least three couplings comprising grooves (17, 18, 22) that run axially to the shank end and coupling gibs (19, 20, 23) on the tool holder (10) that engage in said grooves, and also an axial locking feature comprising a depression (21) in the tool shank (11) that runs axially and is closed toward the shank end and a locking body (16) in the tool holder (10) that engages in said depression, two of said couplings (17, 19 and 18, 20) being at least partially opposite one another. For the purpose of uniform torque loading of tool shank (11) and tool holder (10), the couplings located one behind the other on the shank circumference starting from the axial locking feature are positioned with their coupling flanks on a circumferential angle of >180 DEG , <240 DEG (FIG. 1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B25D 17/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B23B 45/16 (2006.01); B25D 17/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B25D 17/088 (2013.01); B25D 2217/0003 (2013.01); B25D 2217/0034 (2013.01); B25D 2217/0038 (2013.01); B25D 2217/0042 (2013.01); B25D 2217/0049 (2013.01); Y10T 279/17076 (2013.01); Y10T 279/17085 (2013.01); Y10T 279/17752 (2013.01); Y10T 408/907 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6089798 A 20000718; AT 199672 T 20010315; AU 1271495 A 19950801; AU 681927 B2 19970911; BR 9408483 A 19970826; CA 2180542 A1 19950720; CA 2180542 C 20000801; CN 1062206 C 20010221; CN 1141608 A 19970129; CZ 287520 B6 20001213; CZ 9602006 A3 19970212; DE 59409686 D1 20010419; DK 0739267 T3 20010709; EP 0739267 A1 19961030; EP 0739267 B1 20010314; ES 2155885 T3 20010601; FI 962843 A0 19960712; FI 962843 A 19960712; JP H09504236 A 19970428; RU 2143333 C1 19991227; SK 283037 B6 20030204; SK 89796 A3 19970806; WO 9519244 A1 19950720

INPADOC legal status


2009-08-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071224

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051220

- Year of fee payment: 12

2008-04-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061226

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070102

2008-03-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20061226

2008-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070102

2007-11-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061224

2007-11-24 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061224

2007-10-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20070831

2007-09-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070701

2007-08-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20061224

2007-08-21 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-08-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-08-06 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2007-07-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070701

2006-12-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061231

2006-12-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061231

2006-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20061231

- Year of fee payment: 13

2006-12-25 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061225

2006-07-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060701

2005-12-27 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20051227

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-12-27 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20051227

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-12-23 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20051223

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-12-23 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20051223

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-12-23 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20051223

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-12-22 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20051222

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-12-20 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20051220

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-12-20 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20051220

- Year of fee payment: 12

2005-02-08 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20050208

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-03-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-07-09 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2001-06-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010517

2001-06-05 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: STUDIO JAUMANN P. & C. S.N.C.

2001-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2155885 T3

2001-04-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59409686 20010419

2001-04-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-03-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: SCINTILLA AG, DIREKTION

2001-03-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-03-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 199672 T 20010315

2000-04-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20000306

1996-10-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960814

1996-10-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE