Global Patent Index - EP 0739294 B1

EP 0739294 B1 2000-03-15 - CLOSURE WITH A TAMPER-EVIDENT ELEMENT

Title (en)

CLOSURE WITH A TAMPER-EVIDENT ELEMENT

Title (de)

Verschluss mit Originalitätssicherungselement

Title (fr)

Fermeture à élement revelant une tentative de fraude

Publication

EP 0739294 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95909355 A

Priority

  • US 9501093 W
  • US 19327394 A
  • US 35312994 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9521096A1] A tamper-evident closure (20) is provided with a base (24) having a deck (28) with a discharge aperture. A lid (50) is included for covering the discharge aperture on the base. The lid (50) defines a latch aperture (80). The base (24) has a resilient locking lever (70) that projects from the base deck (28) and through the lid latch aperture when the lid (50) is closed. The lever engages the lid and holds the lid closed. A tamper-indicating element (54) is provided on the lid (50) to prevent operation of the lever. The element (54) is attached to the lid (50) with frangible portions which can be broken when sufficient force is applied to remove at least a part of the element (54) and permit operation of the lever (70) whereby another part of the element remains on the lid (50) to provide evidence that part of the element has been removed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 43/16; B65D 50/04; B65D 55/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 43/16 (2006.01); B65D 50/04 (2006.01); B65D 55/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 55/024 (2013.01); B65D 50/045 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9521096 A1 19950810; AU 1734395 A 19950821; AU 679338 B2 19970626; BR 9506732 A 19970923; CA 2179829 A1 19950810; CN 1054584 C 20000719; CN 1140437 A 19970115; DE 69515641 D1 20000420; DE 69515641 T2 20001116; EP 0739294 A1 19961030; EP 0739294 A4 19980610; EP 0739294 B1 20000315; ES 2145906 T3 20000716; JP H09508607 A 19970902; MX 9602408 A 19970228; SG 42787 A1 19971017

INPADOC legal status


2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010131

2005-01-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050126

2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20020211

2002-05-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2002-03-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020329

2001-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20011101

2001-09-12 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20010126

2001-02-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-01-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010127

2001-01-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010126

2000-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2145906

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2000-05-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2000-04-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69515641

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-04-20

2000-04-13 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: GUZZI E RAVIZZA S.R.L.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-03-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1999-04-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990302

1998-06-10 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 19980420

1998-06-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

1996-10-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19960624

1996-10-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT