Global Patent Index - EP 0739612 B1

EP 0739612 B1 2000-06-07 - Device for the artificial insemination of sows

Title (en)

Device for the artificial insemination of sows

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur künstlichen Befruchtung von Sauen

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'insémination artificielle de truies

Publication

EP 0739612 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96104856 A

Priority

DE 29505177 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0739612A2] The catheter (10) has a tube (112) ending in a thickened stopper-type portion (116), while a semen vessel can be connected to the tube. The vagina is kept clean by a sterility funnel (11) partly enclosing the thickened portion, and which is partly cylindrical, having a tip (121) at the end which can be opened. At the other end, it is partly enclosed by a ring portion (123) protruding outwards. The tip can have one or more opening cuts (124), typically formed or bridged by thin film which can be broken. It can be of truncated-cone shape. The internal diameter of the cylindrical portion can be equal to or less than the external diameter of the catheter thickened portion.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61D 19/00; A61D 19/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61D 19/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61D 19/027 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FR NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 29505177 U1 19950518; DK 0739612 T3 20001023; EP 0739612 A2 19961030; EP 0739612 A3 19970305; EP 0739612 B1 20000607; ES 2148618 T3 20001016

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151001

2015-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59605382

2015-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140328

2015-04-30 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2015-04-27 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20150427

2015-02-27 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141001

2015-01-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2014-12-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20141128

2014-10-22 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-10-20 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20140331

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140328

- Year of fee payment: 19

2013-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20130320

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20130326

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-04-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130408

- Year of fee payment: 18

2013-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20130320

- Year of fee payment: 18

2001-05-23 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-10-23 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2148618 T3

2000-09-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-07-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605382 20000713

2000-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR NL

1998-07-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980610

1997-10-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970830

1997-03-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR NL

1996-10-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR NL