Global Patent Index - EP 0739646 B1

EP 0739646 B1 2000-01-12 - Binding element assembly for boots on skis

Title (en)

Binding element assembly for boots on skis

Title (de)

Bindungssystem für Schuhe auf Skiern

Title (fr)

Elément de retenue d'une chaussure sur un ski

Publication

EP 0739646 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96104945 A

Priority

FR 9505317 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0739646A1] The binding member consists of two pivoted retaining elements (6, 7) for the toe of the ski boot, mounted in a housing on a base and equipped with a main return spring on a rod. It has an auxiliary spring (22) which is connected to return lugs (6b, 7b) on the inside of the retaining elements by a head (24) which can be engaged with one lug, both or neither. The auxiliary rod (23) is mounted on a plate which turns about a pivot (30), and the head has a series of notches (24d) in it to engage with the lugs.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 9/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 9/08 (2012.01); A63C 9/085 (2006.01); A63C 9/086 (2012.01); A63C 9/088 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 9/0805 (2013.01); A43B 1/0054 (2013.01); A43B 3/0094 (2013.01); A63C 9/08 (2013.01); A63C 9/08521 (2013.01); A63C 9/08578 (2013.01); A63C 9/0802 (2013.01); A63C 9/08571 (2013.01); A63C 9/086 (2013.01); A63C 9/088 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0739646 A1 19961030; EP 0739646 B1 20000112; AT 188625 T 20000115; DE 69606082 D1 20000217; DE 69606082 T2 20000824; FR 2733431 A1 19961031; FR 2733431 B1 19970704; JP H08299528 A 19961119

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071002

2007-11-24 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070328

2006-03-23 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060323

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-03-13 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20060313

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-03-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050328

2002-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

- Ref Legal Event Code: PL

2002-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020331

2002-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020331

2001-02-28 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20010228

- Year of fee payment: 6

2000-12-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2000-04-06 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: DOTT. GIOVANNI LECCE & C.

- Ref Legal Event Code: ITF

2000-02-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69606082

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-02-17

2000-01-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2000-01-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE IT LI

2000-01-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 188625

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2000-01-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

1999-07-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 19990601

1999-06-23 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RTI1

- Free Format Text: BINDING ELEMENT ASSEMBLY FOR BOOTS ON SKIS

1997-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 19970421

1996-10-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE IT LI