Global Patent Index - EP 0739663 B1

EP 0739663 B1 2000-05-24 - Machine for forming workpieces

Title (en)

Machine for forming workpieces

Title (de)

Bearbeitungsmaschine zum Umformen von Werkstücken

Title (fr)

Machine pour former des pièces

Publication

EP 0739663 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96104110 A

Priority

DE 29506877 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0739663A2] The machine comprises a tool which consists of two halves (1,23) at opposite sides of the workpiece. One half (23) moves against the latter, and works with a punch (4) in the other half (1). The punch moves against the workpiece, and is driven by the half on the opposite side and in the opposite direction to the latter, either via the workpiece itself or a support for it. The workpiece can act on a ram supplying a medium under pressure to the punch. The ram can be pneumatic or hydraulic, or a mechanical drive with wedge or lever can be used. The punch can be mounted on a thrust-piece sliding in the tool half (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21D 28/24; B21D 22/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 28/02 (2006.01); B21D 22/04 (2006.01); B21D 22/06 (2006.01); B21D 28/14 (2006.01); B21D 37/08 (2006.01); B30B 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 22/06 (2013.01); B21D 22/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 29506877 U1 19950622; EP 0739663 A2 19961030; EP 0739663 A3 19970827; EP 0739663 B1 20000524; JP H08323432 A 19961210; US 5778721 A 19980714

INPADOC legal status


2016-03-14 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59605281

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150320

- Year of fee payment: 20

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090314

2010-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20091123

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090314

2010-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090331

2010-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090331

2009-12-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20091130

2009-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20090314

2009-10-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2008-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20080228

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080318

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20080307

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20080304

- Year of fee payment: 13

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-09-20 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000825

2000-08-18 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: MODIANO & ASSOCIATI S.R.L.

2000-07-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605281 20000629

2000-05-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-05-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1998-11-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980923

1998-04-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980209

1997-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI

1996-10-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI