Global Patent Index - EP 0739725 B1

EP 0739725 B1 2002-09-04 - Quick tightening system for change of printing plates

Title (en)

Quick tightening system for change of printing plates

Title (de)

Schnellbefestigungssystem für Druckplattenwechsel

Title (fr)

Système de fixation rapide de changement des plaques d'impression

Publication

EP 0739725 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 95500066 A

Priority

EP 95500066 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0739725A1] The QUICK TIGHTENING SYSTEM FOR CHANGE OF PRINTING PLATES consists of two hydraulic clamps (4.5) that are to be located in the hollow (3) of the printing plate cylinder (1), that fixes the ends of the plate (6) between the teeth, actioned by a hydraulic circuit (8.9) that permits, in one second, the fixing of the printing plate's edges over their whole length, adjusting itself around the cylinder. The number of hydraulic pistons (10) that action the teeth depends upon the length of the clamp. This invention permits the quick fixing, warrant the uniform tightening of the edges over their whole length, obtain a equal wear, and obtain an immovable clinch of the printing plate, whose consequence is economy in the preparation of the offset presses used in the Graphical Industry. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B41F 27/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 27/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 27/1231 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR

EPO simple patent family

EP 0739725 A1 19961030; EP 0739725 B1 20020904; DE 69528040 D1 20021010

INPADOC legal status


2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-06-20 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-03-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030328

2002-12-05 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021205

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69528040 20021010

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR

2002-09-04 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-04 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-06-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: TGA INGENIERIA GRAFICA, S.L.

1999-08-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990607

1997-07-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970421

1996-10-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR