Global Patent Index - EP 0740015 B1

EP 0740015 B1 2000-01-26 - Ethylenediaminetriacetic acid and salts thereof as chelating agents in pulp bleaching

Title (en)

Ethylenediaminetriacetic acid and salts thereof as chelating agents in pulp bleaching

Title (de)

Ethylendiamintriessigsäure und ihre Salze als chelatbildende Mittel für das Bleichen von Zellstoff

Title (fr)

L'acide éthylène diamine tri-acétique et les sels obtenus à partir de celui-ci comme agents de chélation dans le blanchiment de pâte

Publication

EP 0740015 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96106367 A

Priority

US 43107895 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0740015A1] A process for metal ion chelation in pulps. Extraction and removal of detrimental metal ions, preferentially manganese, iron and copper, prior to delignification and bleaching is carried out on pulp, preferably kraft pulp, using ethylenediaminetriacetic acid or ethylenediaminetriacetic acid salts as the chelating agent. Suitable salts include alkaline earth metal, alkali metal, ammonium and amine.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D21C 9/10; D21C 9/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21C 9/10 (2006.01); D21C 9/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21C 9/163 (2013.01); D21C 9/1042 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FI FR SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0740015 A1 19961030; EP 0740015 B1 20000126; AU 5066896 A 19961107; AU 693011 B2 19980618; BR 9602035 A 19981006; CA 2173824 A1 19961028; DE 69606346 D1 20000302; DE 69606346 T2 20001019; ES 2144168 T3 20000601; ZA 9603060 B 19960730

INPADOC legal status


2004-05-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030514

2003-02-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2002-12-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021231

2002-11-19 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2002-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20021101

2002-04-24 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020424

2002-04-24 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020424

2002-04-23 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020423

2001-04-26 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20010426

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-04-12 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20010412

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-04-03 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20010403

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-02-19 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20010219

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-02-09 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20010209

- Year of fee payment: 6

2001-01-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-06-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2144168 T3

2000-04-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-03-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69606346 20000302

2000-01-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FI FR SE

1999-05-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990324

1997-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970422

1996-10-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FI FR SE