Global Patent Index - EP 0740025 B1

EP 0740025 B1 2000-12-13 - Gantry

Title (en)

Gantry

Title (de)

Portal

Title (fr)

Portique

Publication

EP 0740025 B1 (EN)

Application

EP 96201123 A

Priority

NL 1000216 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0740025A1] A gantry for spanning a road, for example in connection with the presentation of information to users of the road, comprises a lattice girder(1), which is constructed of at least one uppermost longitudinal element (4,5), a lowermost longitudinal element (6) and lattice elements (7) interconnecting these longitudinal elements, and, at each end of this lattice girder, a pair of upwardly converging legs (2,3). In order to increase stability, the uppermost longitudinal element passes over each pair of legs and is supported there by means of a bearing structure (10,11). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04C 3/40; E01F 9/011

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E01F 9/011 (2006.01); E04C 3/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04C 3/40 (2013.01); E01F 9/696 (2016.02)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0740025 A1 19961030; EP 0740025 B1 20001213; DE 69611200 D1 20010118; NL 1000216 A1 19961028; NL 1000216 C2 19961106; NO 961659 A 19961028; NO 961659 D0 19960425

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-03 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20041101

2004-12-15 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040425

2004-11-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041101

2004-04-25 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040425

2003-04-29 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20030429

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-04-23 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20030423

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-04-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: BAYARDS B.V.

2003-02-26 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-05-11 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-04-25 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010425

2001-03-14 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010314

2001-01-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69611200 20010118

2000-12-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL SE

2000-12-13 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20001213

2000-12-13 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20001213

2000-12-13 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001213

2000-12-13 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001213

2000-12-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001213

1999-10-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990909

1997-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970411

1996-10-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE ES FR GB IT LU NL SE