Global Patent Index - EP 0740031 B1

EP 0740031 B1 2001-03-28 - Tool for finishing joints filled with a sealant, particularly with a permanently elastic sealant

Title (en)

Tool for finishing joints filled with a sealant, particularly with a permanently elastic sealant

Title (de)

Werkzeug zur Nachbearbeitung von mit einer Fugenmasse, insbesondere einer dauerelastischen Fugenmasse, gefüllten Fugen

Title (fr)

Outil pour la finition des joints remplis avec un jointage, en particulier avec un jointage élastique permanent

Publication

EP 0740031 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96106478 A

Priority

  • DE 29506910 U
  • DE 19521903 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0740031A1] The tool comprises a roughly triangular plate forming a main body (10). A straight first edge (2) runs for the full length of the first side (10a) of the body, joining at the end via a radius (3) onto the second edge (4) at an acute angle (alpha). The second and generally straight edge has at its other end a concave-curved portion forming a recess (5), and by which it joins onto a third and straight edge (7). The latter leads to a fourth and curved edge (9), joined by a radius (12) at the other end onto the first edge.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E04F 21/165

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E04F 21/165 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E04F 21/165 (2013.01); E04F 21/1652 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0740031 A1 19961030; EP 0740031 B1 20010328; AT 200130 T 20010415

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-28 [REG NL MK] PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT

- Effective date: 20160424

2016-04-25 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59606655

2016-04-18 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KWM ENTWICKLUNGS-, VERTRIEBS- UND SERVICE GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: KAUL-WERKZEUGE GMBH, 47198 DUISBURG, DE

- Document: DE 59606655

2016-04-18 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59606655

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE UND RECHTSANWALT WEISS, ARAT & , DE

2016-03-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KAUL-WERKZEUGE GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HB UNTERNEHMENSBERATUNG GMBH, KUESSNACHT, CH

- Document: DE 59606655

2016-03-09 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KWM ENTWICKLUNGS-, VERTRIEBS- UND SERVICE GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: HB UNTERNEHMENSBERATUNG GMBH, KUESSNACHT, CH

- Document: DE 59606655

2016-03-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59606655

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE UND RECHTSANWALT WEISS, ARAT & , DE

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150622

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59606655

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE UND RECHTSANWALT DR. WEISS, ARA, DE

2015-07-09 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59606655

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE UND RECHTSANWALT WEISS, ARAT & , DE

2015-06-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150429

- Year of fee payment: 20

2014-03-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59606655

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE UND RECHTSANWALT DRES. WEISS & , DE

2014-03-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59606655

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE UND RECHTSANWALT DR. WEISS & AR, DE

2014-03-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59606655

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE UND RECHTSANWALT DR. WEISS, ARA, DE

2014-03-11 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 59606655

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE UND RECHTSANWALT WEISS, ARAT & , DE

2010-01-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090425

2009-06-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080425

2008-12-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20080425

2008-08-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20080408

- Year of fee payment: 13

2007-03-26 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20070326

- Year of fee payment: 12

2002-03-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: HB UNTERNEHMENSBERATUNG G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20010430

2001-09-27 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010927

2001-08-24 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2001-07-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010626

2001-05-24 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010524

2001-05-24 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010524

2001-05-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606655 20010503

2001-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010430

2001-03-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-03-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB LI NL

2001-03-28 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010328

2001-03-28 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 200130 T 20010415

2000-04-05 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: TOOL FOR FINISHING JOINTS FILLED WITH A SEALANT, PARTICULARLY WITH A PERMANENTLY ELASTIC SEALANT

1999-10-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: HB UNTERNEHMENSBERATUNG GMBH

1999-10-13 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GUTMANN, RUDOLF

1999-07-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19990521

1997-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970425

1996-10-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB LI NL