Global Patent Index - EP 0740043 B1

EP 0740043 B1 2000-06-14 - Door arrangement with right and left rabbet with surround and door leaf

Title (en)

Door arrangement with right and left rabbet with surround and door leaf

Title (de)

Anordnung einer Wendetür mit Zargenrahmen und Türblatt

Title (fr)

Arrangement d'une porte à feuillure à droite et à gauche avec châssis et vantail de porte

Publication

EP 0740043 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96105195 A

Priority

DE 29507001 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0740043A2] The frame (1) is set in an opening in a wall. The door leaf (2) is pivotally joined to the frame by means of a strap hinge (5). The door leaf has a rabbet all round. The peripheral rabbet (6) has a shorter width in the top and bottom transverse part (7) of the door leaf than the lengthwise rabbet (8). The transverse rabbet (7) is about a third of the width of the lengthwise rabbet. The frame part (1) is fitted into the wall opening by an appliance in the corner of the frame and consisting of angle pieces (11) whose free arms (12.1, 12.2) each fit movably into the lengthwise (8) or transverse (7) strut of the frame.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E06B 1/52; E06B 3/32

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E06B 3/32 (2006.01); E05D 7/02 (2006.01); E06B 1/52 (2006.01); E06B 5/16 (2006.01); E06B 3/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E06B 5/164 (2013.01); E05D 7/02 (2013.01); E06B 1/526 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/134 (2013.01); E06B 2003/7055 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 29507001 U1 19960530; AT 193920 T 20000615; CN 1139174 A 19970101; CZ 9601207 A3 19961113; EP 0740043 A2 19961030; EP 0740043 A3 19970502; EP 0740043 B1 20000614; ES 2148620 T3 20001016; HR P960198 A2 19970831; PL 181793 B1 20010928

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111031

2011-11-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59605428

2011-10-31 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59605428

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100217

- Year of fee payment: 15

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070401

2008-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070402

2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-07-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20070402

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070401

2008-02-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-02-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2008-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070401

2008-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071101

2008-01-02 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20071101

2007-12-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070401

2007-12-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2006-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060430

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-04-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20060427

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-04-08 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060408

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-04-06 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20060406

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-03-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060329

- Year of fee payment: 11

2006-03-27 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060327

- Year of fee payment: 11

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-10-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: FIRMA WALTER TECKENTRUP

- Effective date: 20010430

2001-05-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-04-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010430

2001-04-30 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010430

2001-04-01 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010401

2001-03-07 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2001-02-05 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010205

2000-10-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2148620 T3

2000-10-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-09-14 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000914

2000-09-14 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000914

2000-09-14 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000914

2000-09-07 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: FUMERO BREVETTI S.N.C.

2000-08-09 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2000-07-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605428 20000720

2000-07-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: BOVARD AG PATENTANWAELTE

2000-07-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000615

2000-06-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-06-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2000-06-14 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 19960413

2000-06-14 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000614

2000-06-14 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20000614

2000-06-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 193920 T 20000615

2000-03-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: TECKENTRUP, WALTER

1998-12-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981102

1997-09-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970703

1997-05-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1997-05-02 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 960413

1997-04-16 [RHK1] MAIN CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: E06B 1/52

1996-10-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

1996-10-30 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 960413

1996-10-30 [RAX] REQUESTED EXTENSION STATES OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT HAVE CHANGED

- Free text: SI PAYMENT 960413