Global Patent Index - EP 0740080 B1

EP 0740080 B1 2002-09-11 - FILTER-SILENCER

Title (en)

FILTER-SILENCER

Title (de)

FILTERSCHALLDÄMPFER

Title (fr)

FILTRE-SILENCIEUX

Publication

EP 0740080 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96810228 A

Priority

DE 19514990 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0740080A2] The damping components are accommodated in a monobloc housing (2) with a central axis (13). Each component (3) consists of a single metal damping sheet (9) enclosing an absorbent insert (10). They are accommodated in radial grooves (8) in the housing walls, their damping faces (11,12) being parallel to the central axis. Both the components and the grooves can be curved, while air inlet passages (24) of constant cross-section are formed between the components. The cores can be of foam material. Segments (15) on the damping sheets can form an annular coarse filter when the components are installed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04D 29/66; F02M 35/14; F04D 29/42; F04D 29/70

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 35/14 (2006.01); F04D 29/66 (2006.01); F04D 29/70 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04D 29/664 (2013.01); F02M 35/02483 (2013.01); F02M 35/1211 (2013.01); F02M 35/1227 (2013.01); F02M 35/14 (2013.01); F04D 29/701 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

EP 0740080 A2 19961030; EP 0740080 A3 19980107; EP 0740080 B1 20020911; AT 224011 T 20020915; CN 1084850 C 20020515; CN 1136143 A 19961120; CZ 286433 B6 20000412; CZ 9601171 A3 19961113; DE 19514990 A1 19961031; DE 19514990 B4 20050630; JP 2781168 B2 19980730; JP H08296597 A 19961112; KR 100364891 B1 20030315; NO 961620 A 19961025; NO 961620 D0 19960423; US 5756944 A 19980526

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20160411

2016-05-04 [REG GB PE20] PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS

- Expiry date: 20160411

2016-04-12 [REG DE R071] EXPIRY OF RIGHT

- Document: DE 59609637

2015-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150421

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150420

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150421

- Year of fee payment: 20

2015-04-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2003-12-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-09-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030612

2003-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030430

2003-04-12 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030412

2003-03-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030328

2003-03-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2003-01-29 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030107

2002-12-11 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021211

2002-10-17 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59609637 20021017

2002-09-13 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL

2002-09-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-11 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-09-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-09-11 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020911

2002-09-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 224011 T 20020915

2002-04-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB TURBO SYSTEMS AG

2002-03-13 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020128

2002-03-06 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: FILTER-SILENCER

2002-02-27 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: FILTER-SILENCER

2000-06-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ABB TURBO SYSTEMS AG

1998-08-26 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980625

1998-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL

1997-01-15 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ASEA BROWN BOVERI AG

1996-10-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL