Global Patent Index - EP 0740083 B1

EP 0740083 B1 2001-02-14 - Pressure cut-off valve with a shuttle valve piston

Title (en)

Pressure cut-off valve with a shuttle valve piston

Title (de)

Druckabschneidungsventil mit Wechselventilkolben

Title (fr)

Vanne d'arrêt avec une piston de vanne distributrice

Publication

EP 0740083 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96104154 A

Priority

DE 19512143 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19512143C1] The valve (1) has a changeover piston (2b) which can slide between two end positions in a bore (3) under the action of the higher of the pressures in two pipes (A,B). The higher pressure is limited by a piston (5), when the changeover piston is in either end position. The changeover piston also makes a connection (6) in either of its end positions between the pipe with the lower pressure and at least one opening (7) for flushing out the working medium. It may have a seal (9) which seals the higher of the pressures from this opening. The connection may be made through a longitudinal section (8) of the piston which has a dia. which is less than that of the bore, and it may also have axial grooves (11).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F15B 13/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19512143 C1 19960725; EP 0740083 A2 19961030; EP 0740083 A3 19980701; EP 0740083 B1 20010214

INPADOC legal status


2013-04-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110316

2012-03-22 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59606427

- Effective date: 20111001

2012-02-29 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110315

2012-02-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110315

2012-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111001

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110331

2011-12-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111130

2011-11-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20110315

2011-11-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2010-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100512

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20100327

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20100324

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100331

- Year of fee payment: 15

2010-01-29 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20091222

- Year of fee payment: 15

2002-02-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-06-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2001-04-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20010326

2001-03-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59606427 20010322

2001-02-16 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: BUGNION S.P.A.

2001-02-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

2000-02-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991227

1998-09-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19980723

1998-07-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE

1996-10-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT SE