EP 0740280 A3 19971008 - Disturbance detection method for road traffic
Title (en)
Disturbance detection method for road traffic
Title (de)
Verfahren zur Störungserkennung im Strassenverkehr
Title (fr)
Méthode de détection des pertubations pour trafic routièr
Publication
Application
Priority
DE 19515229 A 19950428
Abstract (en)
[origin: EP0740280A2] The system has a measuring point at both the entry and exit of a monitored sector, each providing measured data relating to the number and velocity of the vehicles passing through the sector, evaluated for determining the traffic level and the traffic speed. An expected traffic level is calculated from the number of vehicles entering the sector and compared with the actual traffic level at the end of the monitored sector, to determine the number of vehicles remaining within the latter, with a traffic hold-up when this number exceeds a threshold value.
IPC 1-7
IPC 8 full level
G08G 1/01 (2006.01); G08G 1/065 (2006.01)
CPC (source: EP US)
G08G 1/0104 (2013.01 - EP US); G08G 1/065 (2013.01 - EP US)
Citation (search report)
- [A] EP 0171098 A1 19860212 - PHILIPS NV [NL]
- [A] IOKIBE T ET AL: "TRAFFIC PREDICTION METHOD BY FUZZY LOGIC", PROCEEDINGS OF THE INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON FUZZY SYSTEMS, SAN FRANCISCO, MAR. 28 - APR. 1, 1993, vol. 2, 28 March 1993 (1993-03-28), INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL AND ELECTRONICS ENGINEERS, pages 673 - 678, XP000371490
- [A] RITTICH D ET AL: "PERSPEKTIVEN DER VERKEHRSLEITTECHNIK", NACHRICHTENTECHNISCHE BERICHTE, no. 9, 1 April 1992 (1992-04-01), pages 111 - 119, XP000331875
Designated contracting state (EPC)
AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI NL
DOCDB simple family (publication)
EP 0740280 A2 19961030; EP 0740280 A3 19971008; EP 0740280 B1 19990728; AT E182709 T1 19990815; DE 59602517 D1 19990902; ES 2135134 T3 19991016; US 5684475 A 19971104
DOCDB simple family (application)
EP 96106579 A 19960426; AT 96106579 T 19960426; DE 59602517 T 19960426; ES 96106579 T 19960426; US 63996796 A 19960429