Global Patent Index - EP 0740369 B1

EP 0740369 B1 2000-01-05 - Short-circuit protection for electric igniter for airbags

Title (en)

Short-circuit protection for electric igniter for airbags

Title (de)

Kurzschlusssicherung für elektrische Zünder von Airbags

Title (fr)

Protection contre les court-circuits pour allumeurs électriques d'airbags

Publication

EP 0740369 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96106772 A

Priority

DE 19514864 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0740369A2] The short-circuit protection has a plastics socket (1) incorporating a pair of opposing contact springs (13,14) associated with a common foot part (18) engaging the peripheral wall of the socket. The contact springs are deflected outwards against their spring force from an inner position in which they contact a pair of contact pins (26,27) for the airbag, projecting into the socket. The foot part is embedded in the plastics material of the socket, which has 2 slots (11,12) on its inside parallel to its axis for reception of the contact springs..

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/703; H01R 43/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F42B 3/182 (2006.01); F42C 19/06 (2006.01); H01R 13/703 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F42B 3/182 (2013.01); F42C 19/06 (2013.01); H01R 13/703 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0740369 A2 19961030; EP 0740369 A3 19970326; EP 0740369 B1 20000105; DE 19514864 A1 19961107

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20071101

2006-03-07 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060307

- Year of fee payment: 11

2000-12-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-05 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20000105

2000-06-02 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2000-02-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59604080 20000210

2000-01-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2000-01-05 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000105

2000-01-05 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20000105

2000-01-05 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000105

2000-01-05 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000105

2000-01-05 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000105

1999-12-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: AMI DODUCO GMBH

1998-05-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DODUCO GMBH

1998-04-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980304

1997-06-25 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970426

1997-05-21 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: DODUCO GMBH + CO DR. EUGEN DUERRWAECHTER I.K.

1997-03-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

1996-10-30 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE