Global Patent Index - EP 0740766 B1

EP 0740766 B1 2000-03-08 - GRATING PLATE ARRANGEMENT

Title (en)

GRATING PLATE ARRANGEMENT

Title (de)

ROSTPLATTENANORDNUNG

Title (fr)

ENSEMBLE DE PLAQUES A GRILLES

Publication

EP 0740766 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 95937076 A

Priority

  • DE 4441009 A
  • EP 9504495 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE4441009A1] The invention relates to a grating plate arrangement for multi-stage grates in which several grating plates (2) can be laid side-by-side on a grating support (1) and secured thereto by a clamping device (11) engaging with the grating plate and the support. Here, the clamping device (11) comprises at least one clamping component (12), the end (14) of which on the grating plate side passes through an aperture (15) in a face (3) of the grating plate (2) and is fitted with clamping means (16) actuatable from the face and the end of which on the grating support side has anchoring means (13) for force-transmitting engagement with the grating support. This arrangement makes it possible to fit or remove the grating plates from the top of the grating thus rationalising assembly and providing better working protection.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F27B 21/02; F27D 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F27B 21/08 (2006.01); F23H 11/12 (2006.01); F27B 21/02 (2006.01); F27D 15/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F27B 21/02 (2013.01); F27D 15/022 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE DK ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 4441009 A1 19960523; DE 4441009 C2 20010329; AT 190393 T 20000315; AU 3928895 A 19960617; AU 692324 B2 19980604; BR 9506616 A 19970916; CA 2180367 A1 19960530; CN 1099018 C 20030115; CN 1138895 A 19961225; CZ 292127 B6 20030813; CZ 9602040 A3 19961113; DE 59507962 D1 20000413; DK 0740766 T3 20000731; EP 0740766 A1 19961106; EP 0740766 B1 20000308; ES 2144641 T3 20000616; HU 219944 B 20010928; HU 9601876 D0 19960930; HU T74654 A 19970128; JP 3109524 B2 20001120; JP H09511567 A 19971118; KR 100270795 B1 20001201; MX 9602574 A 19981031; PL 179002 B1 20000731; PL 315621 A1 19961125; RU 2129693 C1 19990427; TR 9501452 A2 19960721; TW 324779 B 19980111; US 5862906 A 19990126; WO 9616306 A1 19960530

INPADOC legal status


2014-05-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121116

2014-03-05 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140305

2013-11-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121130

2013-10-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130601

2013-10-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121130

2013-09-12 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59507962

- Effective date: 20130601

2013-08-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121115

2013-08-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121130

2013-08-23 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20130731

2013-07-08 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2013-05-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *VON WEDEL KARL

- Effective date: 20121130

2012-03-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20111122

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20111125

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-01-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20111123

- Year of fee payment: 17

2012-01-31 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20111124

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20101126

- Year of fee payment: 16

2011-02-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20101120

- Year of fee payment: 16

2004-07-07 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031115

2003-11-15 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031115

2003-11-15 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031115

2002-11-19 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20021119

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-10-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20021030

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-02-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2000-07-31 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2000-07-07 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-06-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20000607

2000-06-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2144641 T3

2000-06-08 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: LENZI & C.

2000-04-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59507962 20000413

2000-03-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FR GB IT

2000-03-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 190393 T 20000315

1998-09-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980803

1997-01-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961106

1996-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE DK ES FR GB IT