Global Patent Index - EP 0740767 B1

EP 0740767 B1 2001-02-28 - HEAT EXCHANGER FOR A CONTAMINATED FLUID

Title (en)

HEAT EXCHANGER FOR A CONTAMINATED FLUID

Title (de)

WÄRMETAUSCHER FÜR KONTAMINIERTE FLÜSSIGKEIT

Title (fr)

ECHANGEUR DE CHALEUR POUR FLUIDE CONTAMINE

Publication

EP 0740767 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 95902175 A

Priority

  • FR 9401375 W
  • FR 9306307 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2705769A1] The gap between the tubes (2) has no chicane, the tubes (2) are welded and crimped over the entire thickness of the tube plates (3) and the head (5) via which the cold fluid enters the exchanger is mounted floating in the calender (1) and is connected to the cold fluid inlet flange (8) via a bellows (10). Nuclear industry. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F28F 9/02; F28D 7/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F28D 7/00 (2006.01); F28D 7/16 (2006.01); F28F 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F28F 9/0239 (2013.01); F28D 7/1607 (2013.01); F28D 2021/0054 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

FR 2705769 A1 19941202; FR 2705769 B1 19950811; BG 100732 A 19970331; BG 63057 B1 20010228; DE 69426781 D1 20010405; EP 0740767 A1 19961106; EP 0740767 B1 20010228; RU 2145697 C1 20000220; SK 91996 A3 19971008; WO 9617216 A1 19960606

INPADOC legal status


2014-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20131202

- Year of fee payment: 20

2002-02-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-08-29 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-08-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2001-05-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010529

2001-04-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69426781 20010405

2001-02-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

2001-02-28 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-28 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010228

2001-02-28 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010228

2000-02-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19991228

1997-05-14 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL

1996-11-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19960712

1996-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL