Global Patent Index - EP 0740945 B1

EP 0740945 B1 2000-09-06 - Snowboard with blocks for raising the bindings

Title (en)

Snowboard with blocks for raising the bindings

Title (de)

Gleitbrett mit Unterlage zur Erhöhung der Bindung

Title (fr)

Planche de glisse unique présentant des cales de réhaussement des fixations

Publication

EP 0740945 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 96420147 A

Priority

FR 9505492 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0740945A1] The snow board (1) has a maximum thickness (E) and a width (L) in the central zone. Its lengthwise axis (2) corresponds with its direction of travel. Each boot has front and rear fixings (8,9) on a plate of thickness (F), set at an angle to the board's lengthwise axis and mounted on top of a wedge (14) with a height (H) above the surface of the board. At least one boot/fixing assembly projects over the edge of the board by a distance D. The height H of the wedge is equal to or greater than D-(E+F), and is more than 30 mm. The wedges can be made from wood, a metal alloy, a composition material or a plastic, and can have a vibration damping layer of a viscoelastic material. Their upper surfaces can lie parallel to the surface of the board or inclined downwards towards the toe of the boot.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A63C 5/03; A63C 5/075; A63C 9/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63C 5/03 (2006.01); A63C 5/075 (2006.01); A63C 10/14 (2012.01); A63C 10/26 (2012.01); A63C 10/28 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A63C 10/14 (2013.01); A63C 5/03 (2013.01); A63C 5/075 (2013.01); A63C 10/26 (2013.01); A63C 10/28 (2013.01)

Citation (examination)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR IT LI

EPO simple patent family

EP 0740945 A1 19961106; EP 0740945 B1 20000906; AT 196097 T 20000915; DE 69610138 D1 20001012; DE 69610138 T2 20010111; FR 2733690 A1 19961108; FR 2733690 B1 19970606; US 5775717 A 19980707

INPADOC legal status


2008-07-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070430

2006-04-26 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060426

- Year of fee payment: 11

2005-11-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051101

2005-04-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050430

2004-04-06 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20040406

- Year of fee payment: 9

2004-03-16 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20040316

- Year of fee payment: 9

2001-12-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2001-08-22 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-05-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010529

2001-05-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010529

2000-10-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69610138 20001012

2000-09-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-09-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI

2000-09-06 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000906

2000-09-06 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 196097 T 20000915

2000-03-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980618

1998-08-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19980618

1997-01-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19961109

1996-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR IT LI