Global Patent Index - EP 0740962 B1

EP 0740962 B1 2000-08-09 - Arrangement for coarse crushing of ceramic materials

Title (en)

Arrangement for coarse crushing of ceramic materials

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Grobzerkleinern keramischer Massen

Title (fr)

Dispositif pour le broyage grossier de materiaux ceramiques

Publication

EP 0740962 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 96107026 A

Priority

DE 19516462 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0740962A1] The device has two rotatable crusher rollers (3,4) whereby one is movable and can be moved to a different height from the other fixed roller (3). An opening (15) is simultaneously released in the machine stand (1) to discharge the material which cannot be crushed. The rotary direction of at least one roller is reversed at least once for this ejection. The ends of the movable roller are mounted in slide blocks which are displaceable in parallel slits in the machine stand. The slide blocks are guided by lift elements (7) into a position where a steep plane (E-E) containing the axes (A,B) of the two rollers is formed with the movable roller lower. The opening is provided on the side of the roller remote from the rolling gap.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B02C 18/16; B02C 18/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B02C 18/14 (2006.01); B02C 18/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B02C 18/142 (2013.01); B02C 18/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 0740962 A1 19961106; EP 0740962 B1 20000809; AT 195270 T 20000815; DE 19516462 A1 19961107; DE 19516462 C2 19970320; ES 2151102 T3 20001216

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090503

2010-10-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090504

2010-07-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090504

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20080526

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080619

- Year of fee payment: 13

2005-03-04 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2005-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-01-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2004-12-22 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040503

2004-12-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041201

2004-05-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-05-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-05-03 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040503

2004-05-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040503

2003-11-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20031128

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-11-27 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20031127

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-11-27 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20031127

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-11-26 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20031126

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-11-03 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20031103

- Year of fee payment: 8

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: INGENIEURBURO FRANZ VOGEL G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20010531

2001-07-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2001-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20010531

2001-01-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2000-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2151102 T3

2000-12-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2000-12-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20001114

2000-11-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: TROESCH SCHEIDEGGER WERNER AG

2000-11-10 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001110

2000-11-09 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20001109

2000-11-08 [ITF] IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED

- Owner name: PORTA CHECCACCI & ASSOCIATI S.P.A.

2000-09-14 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59605695 20000914

2000-08-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2000-08-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT

2000-08-09 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20000809

2000-08-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 195270 T 20000815

1999-01-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 19981208

1997-06-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 19970409

1996-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB GR IT LI NL PT